DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC v. RECLEIM PA LLC et al
Plaintiff: DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC
Defendant: RECLEIM LLC and RECLEIM PA LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03501
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by RECLEIM LLC, RECLEIM PA LLC.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(CARMELI, DANIEL)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL CARMELI on behalf of RECLEIM LLC, RECLEIM PA LLC with Certificate of Service(CARMELI, DANIEL)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER NATHAN KESSLER on behalf of RECLEIM LLC, RECLEIM PA LLC with Certificate of Service(KESSLER, PETER)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment filed by DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(EBBY, ROBERT)
August 13, 2020 Default Entered (mbh, )
August 13, 2020 DEFAULT BY RECLEIM LLC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (mbh, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Default DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC against RECLEIM LLC. (EBBY, ROBERT)
August 12, 2020 Default Entered (mbh, )
August 12, 2020 DEFAULT BY RECLEIM PA LLC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (mbh, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Default DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC against RECLEIM PA LLC. (EBBY, ROBERT) Modified on 8/12/2020 (md, ).
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC re: Francis DiMeo, III served Summons and Complaint upon RECLEIM PA LLC by Personal service. RECLEIM PA LLC served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (EBBY, ROBERT)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC re: Thomas J. Crean, Jr. served Summons and Complaint upon RECLEIM LLC by Personal service. RECLEIM LLC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (EBBY, ROBERT)
July 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to RECLEIM LLC, RECLEIM PA LLC AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ON 7/17/20 (rf, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14427133.), filed by DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(EBBY, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC v. RECLEIM PA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECLEIM LLC
Represented By: DANIEL CARMELI
Represented By: PETER NATHAN KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECLEIM PA LLC
Represented By: DANIEL CARMELI
Represented By: PETER NATHAN KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELAWARE AVENUE, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT L. EBBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?