BEY v. OPTUM SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TASAHIA BEY
Defendant: OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE, INC., OPTUMRX, INC. and UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03506
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE on behalf of OPTUM SERVICES, INC., OPTUMRX, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEINKE, AMANDA)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT EACH PARTY MUST, WITHOUT AWAITING A DISCOVERY REQUEST, PROVIDE THE DISCLOSURES CONTEMPLATED BY RULE26(a) TO ANY OTHER PARTIES WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/9/20. 9/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint together with Defenses by OPTUM SERVICES, INC., OPTUMRX, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE, INC..(PEET, STEPHANIE)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MAY ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON 9/7/20 . SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/20/20. 8/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Stipulation to Extend Defendants Time to Respond to Complaint by OPTUM SERVICES, INC., OPTUMRX, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE, INC.. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (PEET, STEPHANIE) Modified on 8/20/2020 (fb).
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE JILL PEET on behalf of OPTUM SERVICES, INC., OPTUMRX, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEET, STEPHANIE)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by TASAHIA BEY. Amendment to #4 Affidavit of Service served Complaint and Summons on United Health Group, Inc. upon L. Dorenberger by Certified Mail with USPS Tracking History showing July 28, 2020 date of service. (DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Chris DelGaizo re: served Complaint and Summons on United Healthcare, Inc. upon Illegible by Certified Mail on July 28, 2020 (DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Chris DelGaizo re: served Complaint and Summons on United Health Group, Inc. upon L. Dorenberger by Certified Mail. (NO DATE ON RECEIPT). (DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 8/7/2020 (fb).
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Chris DelGaizo re: served Complaint and Summons on Optum RX, Inc. upon M. Barajas by Certified Mail on July 27, 2020 (DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Terry Bumgardner re: served Complaint and Summons for Optum Services, Inc. upon Stefoni Murphy, Intake Specialist by Personal Service on 7/20/2020 (DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER)
July 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to OPTUM SERVICES, INC., OPTUMRX, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/17/20 (JL)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OPTUM SERVICES, INC., OPTUMRX, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14428232.), filed by TASAHIA BEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEY v. OPTUM SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE
Represented By: STEPHANIE JILL PEET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE
Represented By: STEPHANIE JILL PEET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMRX, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE
Represented By: STEPHANIE JILL PEET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE
Represented By: STEPHANIE JILL PEET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASAHIA BEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. DELGAIZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?