KNOWLES v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff: ATINA KNOWLES
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY - OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION and TEMPLE UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 2:2020cv03513
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR 9/22/2020 AT 3:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 9/8/20. 9/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY.(HAMBURG, NEIL)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (afm, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS GRANTED. COUNTS I AND II, ONLY, OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS NOT DISMISSED. DEFENDANT TEMPLE UNIVERSITY SHALL ANSWER COUNT III OF THE COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 8/18/20.8/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ATINA KNOWLES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(REIL, WILLIAM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(HAMBURG, NEIL)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 636(C) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 73. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/23/20. 7/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S PROCEDURE FOR ASSIGNMENT OF A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO CERTAIN DISTRICT COURT JUDGES ON A ROTATING BASIS, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 07/22/2020. 07/23/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY.. (HAMBURG, NEIL)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, AUGUST 11, 2020, AT 10:30 A.M., IN ROOM 9614, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/20/20. 7/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY , PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 200601905, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14429286), filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(HAMBURG, NEIL) Modified on 7/20/2020 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNOWLES v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATINA KNOWLES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. REIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY - OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: NEIL J. HAMBURG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: NEIL J. HAMBURG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?