Coppola et al v. UNITED STATES
Plaintiff: Elco Corporation and Peter Coppola
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 2:2020cv03517
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 12/11/2020. (sfl, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER finding as moot #4 MOTION TO STAY. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/12/2020.8/12/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/12/2020. 8/12/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA SANTORO MELLEY on behalf of UNITED STATES with Certificate of Service(MELLEY, REBECCA)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/5/2020 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION to Stay Disqualification filed by Peter Coppola, Elco Corporation.Motion to Stay Disqualification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney, Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kw, )
July 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/20/2020. SUMMONS E-MAILED TO AUSA ON 7/20/2020. (bw, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Praecipe to attach exhibit to complaint by Peter Coppola, Elco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD) Modified on 7/17/2020 (fb).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14429798.), filed by Peter Coppola, Elco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD) Modified on 7/17/2020 (fb). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/20/2020) (fb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coppola et al v. UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elco Corporation
Represented By: CONRAD J. BENEDETTO
Represented By: MICHELLE A. FIORAVANTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Coppola
Represented By: CONRAD J. BENEDETTO
Represented By: MICHELLE A. FIORAVANTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: GREGORY B. DAVID
Represented By: REBECCA SANTORO MELLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?