KARAMOKO v. POLEY
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED KARAMOKO
Defendant: SHERRY POLEY
Case Number: 2:2020cv03518
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by MOHAMMED KARAMOKO Letter to Judge Robreno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BARRIST, ADAM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Ronald Vance, Deputy Clerk to Hon. Eduardo C. Robreno to Adam Barrist, Esq. dated August 26, 2020, re: A review of the Court's records shows that a pleading has not been filed in response to the complaint in the above-captioned action. You may file a request with the Clerk of Court for an entry of default in accordance with Rule 55 of the F.R.C.P. If the request for default is not filed by September 18, 2020 the Court may enter an order dismissing the case against the Defendant(s) for lack of prosecution. (rv)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LYNN A. ZIKOSKI on behalf of SHERRY POLEY (ZIKOSKI, LYNN)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by FED EX WITH SIGNATURE CONFIRMATION re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon DEFENDANT by FED EX WITH SIGNATURE CONFIRMATION on 07/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BARRIST, ADAM)
July 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to SHERRY POLEY. E-mailed to counsel on 7/20/20 (mbh, )
July 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MOHAMMED KARAMOKO. (JL )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHERRY POLEY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14429893.), filed by MOHAMMED KARAMOKO.(BARRIST, ADAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KARAMOKO v. POLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED KARAMOKO
Represented By: ADAM S. BARRIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRY POLEY
Represented By: LYNN A. ZIKOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?