BUSSIE v. AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ROSETTA BUSSIE
Defendant: PILOT CATASTROPHE SERVICES, INC. and AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv03519
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by PILOT CATASTROPHE SERVICES, INC..Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A)(CAMPBELL, GLENN)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Brief filed by AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.Exhibt A, Memorandum, Text of Proposed Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to File A Reply Brief, #2 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FARANDA-DIEDRICH, MATTHEW)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (rf, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ROSETTA BUSSIE. (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ROSETTA BUSSIE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Certificate of Service COS)(ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PILOT CATASTROPHE SERVICES, INC..Brief and Certificate of Service.(CAMPBELL, GLENN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Exhibits, Text of Proposed Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 4 to Memorandum, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(FARANDA-DIEDRICH, MATTHEW)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT (DOC. #7 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/10/2020.8/11/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, PILOT CATASTROPHE SERVICES, INC., filed by ROSETTA BUSSIE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit All Exhibits)(ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROSETTA BUSSIE. (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Exhibits, Certificate of Service, Text of Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 4 to Memorandum, #6 Exhibit 5 to Memorandum, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(FARANDA-DIEDRICH, MATTHEW)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY on behalf of ROSETTA BUSSIE with Jury Demand(KOVALSKY, MICHAEL)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(NASSAR, ALEXANDER)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER J. NASSAR on behalf of AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(NASSAR, ALEXANDER)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PILOT CATASTROPHE SERVICES, INC..(CAMPBELL, GLENN)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN M. CAMPBELL on behalf of PILOT CATASTROPHE SERVICES, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(CAMPBELL, GLENN)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14429911), filed by AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(FARANDA-DIEDRICH, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUSSIE v. AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSETTA BUSSIE
Represented By: JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN
Represented By: MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PILOT CATASTROPHE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: GLENN M. CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MATTHEW P. FARANDA-DIEDRICH
Represented By: ALEXANDER J. NASSAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?