Terry v. Ramson et al
Petitioner: Nathan Terry
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, District Attorney of Norristown, PA, Montgomery County, Kevin Ramson and ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA
Case Number: 2:2020cv03521
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LINDA K CARACAPPA
Referring Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 26 Statement by Nathan Terry. * ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 25 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (jpd, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2020: #1 DJ PAPER WORK, #2 COMPLAINT, #3 DEF REQUEST, #4 APPLICATION, #5 ORDER, #6 WAIVER, #7 ORDER, #8 ORDER, #9 ORDER, #10 NOTES OF TESTIMONY, #11 ORDER, #12 PRO SE CORRESPONDENE, #13 OPINION, #14 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #15 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #16 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #17 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #18 NOTICE OF APPEAL, #19 ORDER, #20 APPELLATE COURT ORDER) (jpd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2020: #21 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #22 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #23 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #24 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #25 PRO SE FILING, #26 PRO SE FILING, #27 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #28 PETITION, #29 ORDER, #30 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #31 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #32 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #33 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #34 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #35 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #36 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #37 BILL OF INFORMATION, #38 ORDER) (jpd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2020: #41 ORDER, #42 ORDER, #43 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #44 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #45 ORDER, #46 ORDER, #47 ORDER, #48 ORDER, #49 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #50 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #51 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #52 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #53 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #54 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #55 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #56 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #57 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #58 OPINION, #59 APPEAL, #60 PETITION, #61 PRO SE FILING, #62 ORDER, #63 MOTION, #64 PROOF OF SERVICE, #65 ORDER, #66 ORDER, #67 CERTIFICATION, #68 ORDER, #69 ORDER, #70 ORDER, #71 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #72 NOTICE OF APPEAL, #73 EXHIBITS, #74 NOTES OF TESTIMONY, #75 STATEMENT, #76 STATEMENT, #77 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #78 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #79 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #80 REQUEST, #81 ORDER, #82 ORDER, #83 ORDER, #84 STATEMENT, #85 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #86 STATEMENT) (jpd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2020: #87 PETITION, #88 OPINION, #89 FORM REPORT, #90 NOTES OF TESTIMONY, #91 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #92 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #93 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #94 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #95 REQUEST, #96 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #97 MOTION, #98 PETITION, #99 APPLICATION, #100 PRO SE FILING, #101 PETITION, #102 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #103 PETITION, #104 MOTION, #105 MOTION, #106 ORDER, #107 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE, #108 PETITION, #109 ORDER, #110 ORDER, #111 ORDER, #112 ORDER) (jpd, ).
August 25, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #24 TO PLAINTIFF ON 8/25/20. (jaa, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 8/24/20. 8/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 Letter dated 8/17/20 by Nathan Terry (mbh, )
August 19, 2020 DOC. NOS. 18, 22 MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER (ems)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT COURTS PRIOR ORDER OF 8/14/20 (DOC. 19) IS RESCINDED. ORDERED THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY SHALL FILE SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWERS, PURSUANT TO RULE 5, 28 U.S.C. 2254, WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS OF THIS ORDER. AS REQUIRED BY 18 U.S.C. 3771(B)(2), THE COMMONWEALTH IS FURTHER ORDERED TO ENSURE THAT IN A FEDERAL HABEAS CORPUS PROCEEDING ARISING OUT OF A STATE CONVICTION, ANY CRIME VICTIMS ARE AFFORDED THEIR RIGHTS UNDER THE CRIMES VICTIMS ACT, AS AMENDED DECEMBER 1, 2009. THE PROTHONOTARY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY/CLERK OF COURTS OR OFFICE OF JUDICIAL SUPPORT OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST-CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. NATHAN TERRY, CP-46-CR-0005665-2016, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA ON 8/14/20. 8/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO TERRY AND EMAILED.(rf, )
August 17, 2020 Document #19 mailed to pro se petitioner. (kw, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. FALIN on behalf of ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA, District Attorney of Norristown, PA, Montgomery County, Kevin Ramson with Certificate of Service(FALIN, ROBERT)
August 14, 2020 COPY OF PETITION (DOC.1); AMENDED PETITION (DOC.16); AMENDED PETITION (DOC.17) AND ORDER TO RESPOND (DOC. 19) EMAILED TO DA MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (jaa, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY SHALL FILE SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWERS, PURSUANT TO RULE 5, 28 U.S.C. 2254, WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS OF THE FILING OF PETITIONERS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF HIS PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. AS REQUIRED BY 18 U.S.C. 3771(B)(2), THE COMMONWEALTH IS FURTHER ORDERED TO ENSURE THAT IN A FEDERAL HABEAS CORPUS PROCEEDING ARISING OUT OF A STATE CONVICTION, ANY CRIME VICTIMS ARE AFFORDED THEIR RIGHTS UNDER THE CRIMES VICTIMS ACT, AS AMENDED DECEMBER 1, 2009. THE PROTHONOTARY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY/CLERK OF COURTS OR OFFICE OF JUDICIAL SUPPORT OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST-CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. NATHAN TERRY, CP-46-CR-0005665-2016, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA ON 8/14/20. 8/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED/FAXED TO THE CLERK OF COURT OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY AND NOT MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, ) Modified on 8/14/2020 (jaa, ). Modified on 8/19/2020 (rf, ). *ORDER IS RESCINDED PER COURT ORDER OF 8/19/20, DOC. 22*
August 13, 2020 Emailed Petition (doc. 1), Amended Petition (doc. 16), Amended Petition (doc. 17), Order (doc. 18) and docket to DA of Montgomery County and Attorney General Criminal Division. (er, )
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LINDA K. CARACAPPA, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL - CRIMINAL LAW DIVISION WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 8/13/20. 8/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER) (er, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 Letter by Nathan Terry, Envelope Attached (rf, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA, District Attorney of Norristown, PA, Montgomery County, Kevin Ramson, filed by Nathan Terry.(amas, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA, District Attorney of Norristown, PA, Montgomery County, Kevin Ramson, filed by Nathan Terry., EXHIBITS, ENVELOPE ATTACHED.(rf, ) Modified on 8/10/2020 (md, ).
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Nathan Terry..(rf, )
July 27, 2020 Document #14 mailed to pro se litigant with form. (nd, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH TERRY WITH BLANK COPIES OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM FOR FILING A PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254, BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF TERRY INTENDS TO PURSUE THIS MATTER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254, HE SHALL COMPLETE THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM, SIGN THE COMPLETED PETITION, AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF TERRY FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/24/20. 7/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER).(er, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nathan Terry. (JL )
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 NATHAN TERRY APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS..(JL ) (NO ENVELOPE)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:20-cv-01065. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - ORDERED that: 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER the above-captioned action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/15/2020. (ktt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/17/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nathan Terry. (ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/17/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Nathan Terry. (ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/17/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathan Terry.(ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/17/2020.] Modified on 7/17/2020 (md, ).
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Nathan Terry (ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 06/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis. (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Nathan Terry.(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 7/17/2020.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Designation Form) (md, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #2 Case Management Track Form) (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Ramson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: District Attorney of Norristown, PA, Montgomery County
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Ramson
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA
Represented By: ROBERT M. FALIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?