Ruiz v. Bristol House Memory Care, LLC
Plaintiff: John Ruiz
Defendant: Bristol House Memory Care, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03524
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JACOB M. SITMAN on behalf of Bristol House Memory Care, LLC with Certificate of Service(SITMAN, JACOB)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Ruiz. Bristol House Memory Care, LLC waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (DOYLE, BRIAN)
July 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to Bristol House Memory Care, LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/21/20 (JL )
July 20, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Ruiz. (lisad, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14432339.), filed by John Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DOYLE, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Bristol House Memory Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol House Memory Care, LLC
Represented By: JACOB M. SITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ruiz
Represented By: BRIAN M. DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?