MELVIN et al v. KENNEY et al
Plaintiff: JESUS CRUZ, MICHAEL MELVIN, BRION MILLIGAN, STEVEN HARTZELL, MARK PALMA, DAN FARRELLY and ROBERT BANNAN
Defendant: HONORABLE JAMES F. KENNEY, LARRY KRASNER, EMILY BAKER-WHITE doing business as THE PLAIN VIEW PROJECT, MR. RICHARD ROSS, JR. and HONORABLE Danielle Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2020cv03529
Filed: July 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Referring Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVEN HARTZELL, DAN FARRELLY, MICHAEL MELVIN, JESUS CRUZ, BRION MILLIGAN, MARK PALMA, ROBERT BANNAN. RICHARD ROSS, JR waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (TEITELMAN, ANDREW) Modified on 9/10/2020 (lisad, ).
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVEN HARTZELL, DAN FARRELLY, MICHAEL MELVIN, JESUS CRUZ, BRION MILLIGAN, MARK PALMA, ROBERT BANNAN. Danielle Outlaw waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (TEITELMAN, ANDREW) Modified on 9/10/2020 (lisad, ).
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVEN HARTZELL, DAN FARRELLY, MICHAEL MELVIN, JESUS CRUZ, BRION MILLIGAN, MARK PALMA, ROBERT BANNAN. LARRY KRASNER waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (TEITELMAN, ANDREW) Modified on 9/10/2020 (lisad, ).
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVEN HARTZELL, DAN FARRELLY, MICHAEL MELVIN, JESUS CRUZ, BRION MILLIGAN, MARK PALMA, ROBERT BANNAN. JAMES F. KENNEY waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (TEITELMAN, ANDREW) Modified on 9/10/2020 (lisad, ).
August 19, 2020 PLEADING #2,3 MAILED TO THE UNREPS (JL ) Modified on 8/20/2020 (lisad, ).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH TO HONORABLE OF THE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/27/20. 7/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/24/2020. 7/24/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, ) Modified on 7/27/2020 (lisad, ).
July 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to EMILY BAKER-WHITE, JAMES F. KENNEY, LARRY KRASNER, Danielle Outlaw, RICHARD ROSS, JR. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/20/2020 (bw, )
July 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROBERT BANNAN, JESUS CRUZ, DAN FARRELLY, STEVEN HARTZELL, MICHAEL MELVIN, BRION MILLIGAN, MARK PALMA. (lisad, )
July 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14431393.), filed by JESUS CRUZ-RODRIGUEZ, BRION MILLIGAN, STEVEN HARTZELL, DAN FARRELLY, MICHAEL MELVIN, MARK PALMA, ROBERT BANNAN.(TEITELMAN, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MELVIN et al v. KENNEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS CRUZ
Represented By: ANDREW TEITELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MELVIN
Represented By: ANDREW TEITELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRION MILLIGAN
Represented By: ANDREW TEITELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HARTZELL
Represented By: ANDREW TEITELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK PALMA
Represented By: ANDREW TEITELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN FARRELLY
Represented By: ANDREW TEITELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BANNAN
Represented By: ANDREW TEITELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONORABLE JAMES F. KENNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY KRASNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY BAKER-WHITE doing business as THE PLAIN VIEW PROJECT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. RICHARD ROSS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONORABLE Danielle Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?