SIMONE v. HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC
Plaintiff: PAUL S SIMONE
Defendant: HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC agent of d/b/a/ HARBORVIEW, LLC, d/b/a HARBORVIEW and HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC doing business as HARBORVIEW, LLC doing business as HARBORVIEW
Case Number: 2:2020cv03551
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Document Number #14 ) by HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC.. (ATKINS, MELISSA) Modified on 9/16/2020 (md, ).
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(ATKINS, MELISSA)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART Settlement Conference held on 9/15/20. (rf, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/2020 01:00 PM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 8/28/20. 8/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART Telephonic Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 8/28/20. (rf, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/28/2020 09:00 AM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 8/25/20. 8/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART; DISCOVERY DUE BY 12/4/2020., DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 12/23/2020., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 1/22/2021., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 12/18/2020., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/23/2021 10:00 AM; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/15/2021., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/15/2021., TRIAL DATE SET FOR 2/25/2021 09:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/25/20. 8/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Conference held on 8/25/20. (rf, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC. (ATKINS, MELISSA)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO 8/25/20 AT 9:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/11/20. 8/11/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Request for continuance of Rule 16 conference by HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC. (ATKINS, MELISSA)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/19/2020 11:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/4/20. 8/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC.(ATKINS, MELISSA)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA K. ATKINS on behalf of HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC (ATKINS, MELISSA)
July 20, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PAUL S SIMONE. (md, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14434602.), filed by PAUL S SIMONE.(SWEENEY, EDWARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMONE v. HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL S SIMONE
Represented By: EDWARD C. SWEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC agent of d/b/a/ HARBORVIEW, LLC, d/b/a HARBORVIEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBORVIEW REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER AT DOYLESTOWN LLC doing business as HARBORVIEW, LLC doing business as HARBORVIEW
Represented By: MELISSA K. ATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?