INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, LLC v. AAA AMERICAN HEALTHCARE LLC et al
Plaintiff: INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, LLC
Defendant: AAA AMERICAN HEALTHCARE LLC, RYAN HATCH, ALBAN HATCH and AMERIHEALTH INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03587
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. ABSENT AN EARLIER RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT, PLAINTIFF SHALL NO LATER THAN 10/21/20 FILE A REQUEST FOR DEFAULT WITH THE CLERK OF COURT. IF THE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT IS NOT TIMELY TIMED, WE MAY ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. ABSENT A DISMISSAL, WE WILL HOLD AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE ON 10/26/20 AT 9:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/18/20.9/18/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(JL )
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, LLC.Request for Default Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FEE, J.)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER TO MR. FEE; FROM ULRIKE HEVENER (DEPUTY TO JUDGE KEARNEY); DATED 9/16/20; RE: DEFAULT (amas, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by J. Kevin Fee re: served Complaint and summons upon AAA American Healthcare LLC by Acceptance of service by counsel on August 24, 2020 (FEE, J.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Letter dated 9/1/20 FROM ULRIKE HEVENER TO J. KEVIN FEE RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC. (JL )
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tamy Holjeson re: served Complaint and Exhibits upon Ryan Hatch by Personal on August 5, 2020 (FEE, J.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tamy Holjeson re: served Complaint and Exhibits upon AmeriHealth Inc. by Personal on August 5, 2020 (FEE, J.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tamy Holjeson re: served Complaint and Exhibits upon Alban Hatch by Personal on August 5, 2020 (FEE, J.)
July 23, 2020 Summons Issued as to AAA AMERICAN HEALTHCARE LLC, AMERIHEALTH INC., ALBAN HATCH, RYAN HATCH. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/23/2020 (bw, )
July 22, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, LLC. (fb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, LLC (AO 120) Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (FEE, J.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AmeriHealth, Inc. with Certificate of Service by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, LLC.(FEE, J.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14441371.), filed by INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(FEE, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, LLC v. AAA AMERICAN HEALTHCARE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA AMERICAN HEALTHCARE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN HATCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBAN HATCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERIHEALTH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, LLC
Represented By: J. KEVIN FEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?