2550 COTTMAN AVE PARTNERS L.P. v. MATTRESS FIRM, INC.
Plaintiff: 2550 COTTMAN AVE PARTNERS, L.P.
Defendant: MATTRESS FIRM, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03607
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/7/2020 03:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS. (Attachments: #1 Conference Information Report, #2 Scheduling & Discovery Policy)(mvh, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER A. LESSER on behalf of 2550 COTTMAN AVE PARTNERS, L.P. (LESSER, PETER)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 ORIGINAL ANSWER to Complaint by MATTRESS FIRM, INC..(GINSBURG TUFFS, CHIMDI)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MATTRESS FIRM, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14444590), filed by MATTRESS FIRM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement Form)(GINSBURG TUFFS, CHIMDI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2550 COTTMAN AVE PARTNERS L.P. v. MATTRESS FIRM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2550 COTTMAN AVE PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By: WILLIAM E. VISS
Represented By: PETER A. LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTRESS FIRM, INC.
Represented By: CHIMDI NWOSU GINSBURG TUFFS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?