HUH., LLC v. BULLDOG HOLDINGS LLC et al
Plaintiff: HUH., LLC
Defendant: BULLDOG HOLDINGS II LLC, BULLDOG ONLINE LLC and BULLDOG HOLDINGS LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03648
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE217477 (dmc, )
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER PLAINTIFF SHALL, NO LATER THAN 8/10/2020, EITHER AMEND ITS COMPLAINT TO DEMONSTRATE OUR SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND VENUE OR SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN (7) PAGES AS TO WHY WE SHOULD (1) NOT DISMISS OR TRANSFER FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AS THE PLAINTIFF DOES NOT PRESENTLY PLEAD A BASIS FOR OUR SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, AND, (2) NOT TRANSFER TO A DISTRICT WHERE THE ACTION MAY OTHERWISE BE BROUGHT AS OUTLINED HERERIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/4/2020. 8/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ka, )
July 27, 2020 Summons Issued as to BULLDOG HOLDINGS II LLC, BULLDOG HOLDINGS LLC, BULLDOG ONLINE LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/3/2020 (bw, )
July 27, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HUH., LLC. (bw, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BULLDOG HOLDINGS II LLC, BULLDOG HOLDINGS LLC, BULLDOG ONLINE LLC (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by HUH., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUH., LLC v. BULLDOG HOLDINGS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BULLDOG HOLDINGS II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BULLDOG ONLINE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BULLDOG HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUH., LLC
Represented By: DAVID M. MANES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?