CALLERY v. HOP ENERGY, LLC
Plaintiff: BRIAN CALLERY
Defendant: HOP ENERGY, LLC and DDM ENERGY
Case Number: 2:2020cv03652
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BRIAN CALLERY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(RYAN, M.)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE REVISED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION BY 9/23/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/16/20.9/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 Request that Court waive its fifteen page limit for Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by BRIAN CALLERY. (RYAN, M.)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 Letter re Request to Strike Plaintiff's Memorandum, in whole or in part filed by HOP ENERGY, LLC..(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD) Modified on 9/17/2020 (md, ).
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S. HALPERN on behalf of HOP ENERGY, LLC with Certificate of Service(HALPERN, ANDREW)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand (Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Motion to Remand) filed by HOP ENERGY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BRIAN CALLERY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(RYAN, M.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HOP ENERGY, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CORRECT CAPTION AND COMPLAINT. DDM ENERGY IS A FICTITIOUS NAME FOR HOP ENERGY, LLC AND SHALL BE REMOVED FROM THE CAPTION OF COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/24/20. 8/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by BRIAN CALLERY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(RYAN, M.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by DDM ENERGY, HOP ENERGY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Mercado Declaration), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF BREAHNA S. WRIGHT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/18/20.8/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF WILLIAM M. MORAN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/18/20.8/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Breahna S. Wright, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14501548.) filed by DDM ENERGY, HOP ENERGY, LLC.Certificate of Service.(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of William M. Moran, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14501522.) filed by DDM ENERGY, HOP ENERGY, LLC.Certificate of Service.(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DDM ENERGY AND HOP ENERGY, LLC ANSWER BY 8/25/2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/13/20. 8/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand filed by BRIAN CALLERY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Certificate of Service)(RYAN, M.)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION BE EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING 8/18/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/31/20. 7/31/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including HOP ENERGY HOLDINGS, INC., DELOS HOP HOLDCO CORP., DELOS HOP HOLDCO LLC, DELOS INVESTMENT FUND II, LLP, SHOREVEST CAPITAL, LLC with Certificate of Service by HOP ENERGY, LLC.(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by HOP ENERGY, LLC Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOP ENERGY, LLC, DDM ENERGY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14452397), filed by HOP ENERGY, LLC, DDM ENERGY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Certificate of Service)(BUTKOVITZ, EDWARD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2020: #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form) (lisad, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/29/2020) (lisad, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/29/2020) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALLERY v. HOP ENERGY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOP ENERGY, LLC
Represented By: EDWARD THOMAS BUTKOVITZ
Represented By: ANDREW S. HALPERN
Represented By: WILLIAM M. MORAN
Represented By: BREAHNA S. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDM ENERGY
Represented By: EDWARD THOMAS BUTKOVITZ
Represented By: WILLIAM M. MORAN
Represented By: BREAHNA S. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN CALLERY
Represented By: EDWARD C. SWEENEY
Represented By: M. FRANCES RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?