WV OXFORD COMMONS, LLC t/a OXFORD COMMONS, L.P. v. SLEEPY'S LLC f/k/a SLEEPYS INC.
Plaintiff: WV OXFORD COMMONS, LLC t/a OXFORD COMMONS, L.P.
Defendant: SLEEPY'S LLC f/k/a SLEEPYS INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03748
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by SLEEPY'S LLC f/k/a SLEEPYS INC..Certificate of Service.(GINSBURG TUFFS, CHIMDI)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #2 ) IS GRANTED AND THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF CHESTER COUNTY, PA. PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS IS DENIED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/22/20.9/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SLEEPY'S LLC f/k/a SLEEPYS INC.. (GINSBURG TUFFS, CHIMDI)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Affirmative Defenses Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by WV OXFORD COMMONS, LLC t/a OXFORD COMMONS, L.P.. (UTAIN, DANIEL)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S PRAECIPE TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT (DOC. NO. #3 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/18/20. 8/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against WV OXFORD COMMONS, LLC t/a OXFORD COMMONS, L.P. by SLEEPY'S LLC f/k/a SLEEPYS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease)(GINSBURG TUFFS, CHIMDI)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Praecipe to Enter Default against Defendant Pursuant to Fed. R.C.P. 55(a) by WV OXFORD COMMONS, LLC t/a OXFORD COMMONS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel R. Utain, Esquire, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(UTAIN, DANIEL)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by WV OXFORD COMMONS, LLC t/a OXFORD COMMONS, L.P..Memorandum of Law, Declaration of Counsel (Exhibit 1) and Certificate of Service.(UTAIN, DANIEL)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SLEEPY'S LLC f/k/a SLEEPYS INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14464062), filed by SLEEPY'S LLC f/k/a SLEEPYS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement Form)(GINSBURG TUFFS, CHIMDI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WV OXFORD COMMONS, LLC t/a OXFORD COMMONS, L.P. v. SLEEPY'S LLC f/k/a SLEEPYS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WV OXFORD COMMONS, LLC t/a OXFORD COMMONS, L.P.
Represented By: DANIEL R. UTAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLEEPY'S LLC f/k/a SLEEPYS INC.
Represented By: CHIMDI NWOSU GINSBURG TUFFS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?