JONES v. MOHELA et al
Plaintiff: IRVING COURTLEY JONES and KARAMO MUCHURI SULIEMAN
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and MOHELA
Trustee: TERRY P. DERSHAW and UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Case Number: 2:2020cv03859
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #4 TO PRO SE AND TRUSTEE ON 9/1/20. (jaa, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED, AND THE MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTY COURT FOR THE EDPA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/1/2020. 9/1/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SER OR TRUSTEE.(sg, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Original Bankruptcy record received together with notice from Bankruptcy Court that the designation of the record on appeal has not been filed. (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT)(amas, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of IRVING COURTLEY JONES from the order of Bankruptcy Judge ERIC L. FRANK filed on 9/7/18. (Attachments: #1 BANKRUPTCY DOCKET)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. MOHELA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRVING COURTLEY JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARAMO MUCHURI SULIEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: TERRY P. DERSHAW
Represented By: TERRY P. DERSHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Represented By: GEORGE M. CONWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: MATTHEW E.K. HOWATT
Represented By: ANTHONY ST. JOSEPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?