Johnson v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Kimberly M. Johnson
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv03939
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance WITH CERTIFICTE OF SERVICE by MICHAEL BONASSO on behalf of BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION(amas, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JON A. STRONGMAN on behalf of BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION(STRONGMAN, JON)
September 10, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION.Withdrawal of Appearance.(ANIELAK, ERIC) Modified on 9/11/2020 (lisad, ).
September 10, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL ALAN TANENBAUM on behalf of BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION(TANENBAUM, MICHAEL)
August 31, 2020 DOC 42 MAILED TO ATTORNEYS WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS. (sg, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT EMILY D. STEEB AND CHRISTINE R.M. KAIN'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 8/26/2020.8/26/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS.(sg, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON L. DUNBAR on behalf of Kimberly M. Johnson with Certificate of Service(DUNBAR, AARON)
August 25, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Christine R. M. Kain ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14518166.) filed by BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
August 25, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. GOMEZ on behalf of Kimberly M. Johnson with Certificate of Service(GOMEZ, CHRISTOPHER)
August 24, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Emily D. Steeb ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14516709.) filed by BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(ABERNETHY, DAVID) (Main Document 38 replaced on 8/25/2020) (nd, ).
August 21, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. ABERNETHY on behalf of BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(ABERNETHY, DAVID)
August 19, 2020 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-22435. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 35 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 7153 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 5 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 8060 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Anger, #8 Exhibit ECF 7003 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo Anger, #9 Exhibit ECF 8147 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Anger, #10 Exhibit ECF 7069 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Anger, #11 Exhibit ECF 7173 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Anger, #12 Exhibit ECF 8077 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 8142 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #16 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #17 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #18 Exhibit ECF 8063 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #19 Exhibit ECF 4831 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE re Caraballo, #20 Exhibit ECF 8145 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo, #21 Exhibit ECF 4973 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #22 Exhibit ECF 5029 - Pltf_s Reply to BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #23 Exhibit ECF 6042 - Memo Opinion and Order re Caraballo, #24 Exhibit ECF 8088 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Little, #25 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #26 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #27 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #28 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #29 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #30 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #31 Exhibit ECF 8141 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Little, #32 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #33 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #34 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #35 Exhibit ECF 8076 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Spiegelberg, #36 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #37 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #38 Exhibit ECF 8149 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Spiegelberg, #39 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #40 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #41 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #42 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #43 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #44 Exhibit ECF 8066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Mays, #45 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo in Support of MTE Mays, #46 Exhibit ECF 8119 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Mays, #47 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 1, #48 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 2, #49 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 3, #50 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 4, #51 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 5, #52 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 6, #53 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 7, #54 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 8, #55 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 9, #56 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 10, #57 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #58 Exhibit ECF 8165 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to MTE Mays, #59 Exhibit ECF 5037 - BSC_s Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #60 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order Mays, #61 Exhibit ECF 8071 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Pence, #62 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #63 Exhibit ECF 8111 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #64 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #65 Exhibit ECF 8166 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #66 Exhibit ECF 5038 - BSC_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #67 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #68 Exhibit ECF 8084 - BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #69 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh A, #70 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B1, #71 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B2, #72 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B3, #73 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B4, #74 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh C, #75 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh D, #76 Exhibit ECF 8117 - Pltf_s Response and Memo in Opp to BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #77 Exhibit ECF 8164 - BSC_s Reply in Support of MTE Rosenzweig, #78 Exhibit ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig, #79 Exhibit ECF 8086 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Trepeta, #80 Exhibit ECF 4811 - BSC_s MTE Trepeta and Memo in Support, #81 Exhibit ECF 8113 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Trepeta, #82 Exhibit ECF 4963 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Trepeta, #83 Exhibit ECF 6050 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Trepeta, #84 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #85 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #86 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #87 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #88 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Anielak, Eric) (Modified on 8/18/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #15 MOTION by Kimberly M. Johnson for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Reinstate Case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/4/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #19 MOTION by Kimberly M. Johnson to Substitute Lee Balefsky as Counsel in lieu of Zachary Peter Lowe; Attorney Zachary Peter Lowe terminated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/4/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mark Finnegan on April 16, 2019 at 8:00 am. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. David Feld on April 10, 2019 at 9:00 am EDT (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kimberly M. Johnson for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Darlene Gaynor on March 5, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Mark Finnegan on March 27, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Kimberly Johnson on February 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kimberly M. Johnson for Responses to First set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Darlene Gaynor on February 12, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Kimberly Johnson on February 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Darlene Gaynor on January 29, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Mark Finnegan on January 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Kimberly M. Johnson to Substitute Lee Balefsky as Counsel in lieu of Zachary Peter Lowe (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order and Writ)(Lowe, Zachary) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL ORDER # 196 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 5 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Boston Scientific Corporation, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 5 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all BSC Wave 5 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 5 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Kimberly M. Johnson for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Reinstate Case (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2326 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2326 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases on inactive docket) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #10 MOTION by Kimberly M. Johnson to Reinstate Case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/25/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Boston Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Boston Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Boston Inactive") (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2326 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2326 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases on inactive docket) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION by Kimberly M. Johnson to Reinstate Case (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lee B. Balefsky on behalf of Kimberly M. Johnson. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lee B. Balefsky on behalf of Kimberly M. Johnson. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2326 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2326 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases on inactive docket) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Boston Scientific Corporation have reached a settlement with regard to BSC. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and BSC may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 3/16/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 1717 in MDL Case No. 2326 Boston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/6/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (bdr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 2, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2014 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 08/05/2014. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 7/14/2014, answer due 9/12/2014. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 103 (THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER FIRST AND SECOND ROUND OF FORMER BELLWETHER CASES) entered on 07/11/2014 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 11, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3327440. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM
Represented By: MICHAEL BONASSO
Represented By: JON A. STRONGMAN
Represented By: ERIC MICHAEL ANIELAK
Represented By: JAMES H. KEALE
Represented By: DAVID F. ABERNETHY
Represented By: EMILY D. STEEB
Represented By: CHRISTINE R.M. KAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly M. Johnson
Represented By: LEE B. BALEFSKY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. GOMEZ
Represented By: AARON L. DUNBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?