BURRELL v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ROCHE BURRELL
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISON OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC. and DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. , A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03999
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Original STATE COURT record together with certified copy of docket AND ORDER forwarded to THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI. (JL )
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL )
August 26, 2020 Original record transferred to the Western District Missouri of via interdistrict transfer system. (lisad, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO TRANSFER VENUE OF THIS ACTION TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI IS HEREBY APPROVED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/24/2020. 8/25/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI, by ROCHE BURRELL, COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISON OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (sg, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK M. ERNY on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISON OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ERNY, FREDERICK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KARA D. HILL on behalf of ROCHE BURRELL with Certificate of Service(HILL, KARA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISON OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISON OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISON OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14499268), filed by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISON OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURRELL v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISON OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPERSURGICAL, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. , A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHE BURRELL
Represented By: TOBIAS MILLROOD
Represented By: KARA D. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?