LINCOLN SQUARE 1766 ASSOCIATES, LLC v. GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: LINCOLN SQUARE 1766 ASSOCIATES, LLC
Defendant: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv04003
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(1), or in the Alternative, Stay filed by LINCOLN SQUARE 1766 ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TROY, PATRICK) Modified on 9/4/2020 (tjd).
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ems)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(1), or in the Alternative, Stay filed by GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BENTZ, AMY)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE MARILYN HEFFLEY. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/18/20. 8/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
August 18, 2020 Filing Fee for COMPLAINT or NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing Fee $400, receipt number 0313-14503112). (BENTZ, AMY)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE by GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(BENTZ, AMY) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINCOLN SQUARE 1766 ASSOCIATES, LLC v. GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINCOLN SQUARE 1766 ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: PATRICK JOSEPH TROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: AMY E. BENTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?