SMITH et al v. ALLSTATE VEHICLE & PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MARGARET SMITH and KENNETH SMITH
Defendant: ALLSTATE VEHICLE, PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY and ALLSTATE VEHICLE & PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv04011
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARILYN HEFFLEY
Referring Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 Affirmative Defenses to Dft Counterclaim by KENNETH SMITH. (WHEELER, JONATHAN)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (afm, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint together with WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIM , COUNTERCLAIM against KENNETH SMITH, MARGARET SMITH by ALLSTATE VEHICLE & PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LABLETTA, CHRISTIAN)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/25/2021., MOTIONS DUE BY 2/16/2021., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 4/19/2021., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/7/2021 09:00 AM; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 6/22/2021 09:30 AM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 9/15/20. 9/15/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/2020 09:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY.(rf, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 636(c) AND FED.R.CIV.P.73. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/4/20. 9/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THE DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS #5 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AND DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER NO LATER THAN 9/18/2020 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/4/2020. 9/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ka, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY Initial Pretrial Telephone Conference held on 9/4/20 (rf, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by KENNETH SMITH, MARGARET SMITH. (WHEELER, JONATHAN)
August 26, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE218222 (dmc, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE 12(b)(6) filed by ALLSTATE VEHICLE & PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(LABLETTA, CHRISTIAN)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KENNETH SMITH, MARGARET SMITH. (WHEELER, JONATHAN)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AN INITIAL PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 9/4/2020 AT 09:00 AM AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/20/2020. 8/20/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(uh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLSTATE VEHICLE, PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(bw, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE VEHICLE, PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEASE OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 200700796. (Filing fee $ 400 ) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Affidavit, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 PROOF OF FILING)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH et al v. ALLSTATE VEHICLE & PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET SMITH
Represented By: JONATHAN WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH SMITH
Represented By: JONATHAN WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE VEHICLE
Represented By: CHRISTIAN P. LABLETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTIAN P. LABLETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE VEHICLE & PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTIAN P. LABLETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?