SHANK v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAWN SHANK
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC F/K/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, TEVA WOMEN, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC. and DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. doing business as TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04012
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 Letter dated 10/8/20 RE: RETURN RECEIPT OF RECORD FROM USDC MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA; ETC. (JL )
October 6, 2020 STATE COURT RECORD WITH LETTER RETURNED TO COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (jaa, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jaa, )
September 21, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #15 TO UNREP. (jaa, )
August 26, 2020 Original record transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania via interdistrict transfer system. (md, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO TRANSFER VENUE OF THIS ACTION TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA IS HEREBY APPROVED, AND FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE STIPULATION, THIS COURTS MEMORANDUM (DOC. NO. 19) AND ORDER (DOC. NO. 20) IN WILLIAMS-HOLLEY V. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., CIVIL ACTION NO. 20-1613(HB)(E.D. PA. AUGUST 4, 2020), AND IN THIS COURTS MEMORANDUM IN BARCELO V. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., CIVIL ACTION NO. 18-3984, 2019 WL 6117305 (E.D. PA. NOV. 18, 2019), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/24/20. 8/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREP NOT MAILED. (va, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICTCOURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., DAWN SHANK, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC(individually and as successor in interest to TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.), TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. Certificate of Service. (va, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK M. ERNY on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC(individually and as successor in interest to TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.), THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ERNY, FREDERICK)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KARA D. HILL on behalf of DAWN SHANK with Certificate of Service(HILL, KARA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/18/2020 (md, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/18/2020 (md, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/18/2020 (md, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/18/2020 (md, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/18/2020 (md, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPERSURGICAL, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/18/2020 (md, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14500774), from the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County Case No. 200400779, filed by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/18/2020 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHANK v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC F/K/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPERSURGICAL
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPERSURGICAL, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. doing business as TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN SHANK
Represented By: TOBIAS MILLROOD
Represented By: KARA D. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?