EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC v. OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS OF EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC
Debtor In Possession: EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Not Classified By Court: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS OF EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC
Appellee: DALMATIA IMPORT GROUP, INC.
Interested Party: Lancaster Fine Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04032
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Referring Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 DOC. 10 MAILED TO ATTORNEY. (sg, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/2/20. 10/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. ATTY ADAMS NOT MAILED. (va, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ON THURSDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2020, AT 3:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/30/20. 9/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 Supplemental Certificate of Appeal for U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3)(nd, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH: Telephone Conference held on 9/23/20. Court Reporter: None. (er, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Earth Pride Organics, LLC by Lancaster Fine Foods, Inc..(CIANCIULLI, JEFFREY)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC.(CIANCIULLI, JEFFREY)
September 17, 2020 PLEADING #4 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ON WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 23, 2020, AT 9:30 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/24/20. 9/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY) AND E-MAILED.(er, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sunfire, LLC by DALMATIA IMPORT GROUP, INC..(SAWCZUK, MARIA)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5)(nd, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC from the order of Bankruptcy Judge ERIC L. FRANK filed on 5/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 BANKRUPTCY DOCKET)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC v. OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS OF EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY S. CIANCIULLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Represented By: DAVID P. ADAMS
Represented By: KEVIN P. CALLAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS OF EARTH PRIDE ORGANICS, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL D. VAGNONI
Represented By: EDMOND M. GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DALMATIA IMPORT GROUP, INC.
Represented By: MARIA SAWCZUK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lancaster Fine Foods, Inc.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. CIANCIULLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?