BURRELL et al v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Anne Burrell and CHARLES BURRELL, SR.
Defendant: GLAXOSMITH KLINE, LLC, CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC. and BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04036
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Original record transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida via inter-district transfer system. (fb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-33) transferring this action to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(mbh, )
August 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITH KLINE, LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/19/2020 (bw, )
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHARLES BURRELL, SR, Anne Burrell. (fb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITH KLINE, LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14504687.), filed by CHARLES BURRELL, SR, Anne Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(MILLER, ROBERT) Modified on 8/19/2020 (fb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURRELL et al v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Burrell
Represented By: ROBERT S. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES BURRELL, SR.
Represented By: ROBERT S. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITH KLINE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHATTEM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?