DUPICHE v. ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Plaintiff: FRITZNER DUPICHE, JR.
Defendant: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv04037
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Report Of Rule 26(f) Report by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. (MUELLER, THOMAS)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS L. MUELLER on behalf of ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY (MUELLER, THOMAS)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2020 AT 10:00 AM WITH LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES BEFORE HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 09/29/2020. 09/29/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(STEIN, BONNIE)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 09/11/2020.09/11/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, filed by FRITZNER DUPICHE, JR.(DOTO, VINCENT)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ems)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Attorney Certification of Good Faith, #4 Certificate of Service)(STEIN, BONNIE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Filing of Notice for Removal with State Court by BONNIE S. STEIN on behalf of ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY(STEIN, BONNIE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Arbitration Certification Damages in Excess of $150,000.00 by FRITZNER DUPICHE, JR. (DOTO, VINCENT) Modified on 8/20/2020 (fb).
August 19, 2020 Case Eligible for Arbitration(fb)
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. (fb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY.(STEIN, BONNIE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14504764), filed by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Notice of Removal to Adversary, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Certificate of Service)(STEIN, BONNIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUPICHE v. ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRITZNER DUPICHE, JR.
Represented By: VINCENT J. DOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: BONNIE S. STEIN
Represented By: THOMAS L. MUELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?