Berman et al v. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Berman and Mellisa Clout
Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv04050
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(ANDREUZZI, LINDSAY)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Berman, Mellisa Clout. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (TANNENBAUM, CHARLES)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY ANDREUZZI on behalf of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(ANDREUZZI, LINDSAY)
August 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/20/20 (JL )
August 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeffrey Berman, Mellisa Clout. (JL )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT BERMAN & CLOUT against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14506896.), filed by Jeffrey Berman, Mellisa Clout.(TANNENBAUM, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berman et al v. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Berman
Represented By: CHARLES L. TANNENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mellisa Clout
Represented By: CHARLES L. TANNENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LINDSAY ANDREUZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?