MESSINA v. WESTMINSTER AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Michael Messina
Defendant: Westminster American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv04051
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/28/2020 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY on behalf of MICHAEL MESSINA with Jury Demand(KOVALSKY, MICHAEL)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL P. ROSNER on behalf of WESTMINSTER AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (ROSNER, DANIEL)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Discovery Plan by WESTMINSTER AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(ADAMS, CHARLES)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by WESTMINSTER AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(ADAMS, CHARLES)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTMINSTER AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14506938), from the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County Case No. 200401698, filed by WESTMINSTER AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(ADAMS, CHARLES) Modified on 8/20/2020 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MESSINA v. WESTMINSTER AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Messina
Represented By: JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN
Represented By: MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westminster American Insurance Company
Represented By: CHARLES M. ADAMS
Represented By: DANIEL P. ROSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?