ROBERTS et al v. ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Plaintiff: LILLIE ROBERTS and RANDALL ROBERTS
Defendant: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv04067
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THE CLERK OF THE COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 09/17/2020.09/17/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER WEIR, JR on behalf of LILLIE ROBERTS, RANDALL ROBERTS with Certificate of Service(WEIR, WALTER)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(WALTERS, MARK)
August 26, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE218221 (dmc, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Allstate policy, #2 Exhibit B - Denial letter, #3 Certificate of Service)(WALTERS, MARK)
August 19, 2020 Case Eligible for Arbitration(bw, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEASE OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 200601617. (Filing fee $ 400 ) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Affidavit, #6 PROOF OF FILING, #7 Exhibit A)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERTS et al v. ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LILLIE ROBERTS
Represented By: MICHAEL P. BROADHURST
Represented By: WALTER WEIR, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL ROBERTS
Represented By: MICHAEL P. BROADHURST
Represented By: WALTER WEIR, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: MARK J. WALTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?