HARRIS v. QUAY et al
Petitioner: RANDOLPH S. HARRIS
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF: MARYLAND and WARDEN QUAY
Case Number: 2:2020cv04080
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Original record transferred to District of MARYLAND via interdistrict transfer system. (lvj, )
September 8, 2020 Document #3 mailed to pro se petitioner. (kw, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF MARYLAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/8/20. 9/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(jpd,)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
August 26, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PPE218244 (dmc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2254 FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY filed by RANDOLPH S. HARRIS. *NO FILING FEE OR IFP. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS v. QUAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF: MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN QUAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RANDOLPH S. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?