Blackstone v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Blackstone
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, C R BARD INC and DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE
Case Number: 2:2020cv04092
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 DOC. NO. 29 MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 10/13/2020. (md, )
September 22, 2020 Document #38 mailed to attorneys. (kw, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/22/20 IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/21/20. 9/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #34 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 09/17/2020.09/17/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC., C R BARD INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
September 16, 2020 Filing 35 Praecipe to Withdraw the Parties Joint Motion to Stay (Doc. No. 28) and the Joint Report of 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan (Doc. No. 31) by Sharon Blackstone. (MANKOFF, JOSHUA)
September 15, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steven S. Schulte ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14567356.) filed by Sharon Blackstone.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(MANKOFF, JOSHUA)
September 15, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA M. MANKOFF on behalf of Sharon Blackstone with Certificate of Service(MANKOFF, JOSHUA)
September 15, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE RESCHEDULED PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESET FOR 9/22/2020 09:30 AM NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE: COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE DIAL IN INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.govBEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 31 Report Of Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC., C R BARD INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)
September 11, 2020 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT ON ADMISSION, by Sharon Blackstone. (va, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION TO DISMISS MCKESSON CORP WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/9/20. 9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, ) NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. Modified on 10/13/2020 (md, ).
September 9, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC., C R BARD INC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FEENEY, BRIAN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of McKesson Corporation by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC., C R BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
September 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY and Jessica Natali on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC., C R BARD INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(FEENEY, BRIAN) (Added Jessica Natali per chambers approval) Modified on 9/15/2020 (md, ).
September 1, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/2020 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE. COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE DIAL IN INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.govBEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02317. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Dennis Aaron's case be severed and transferred to the Huntsville Division of the Northern District of Alabama (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2316-S Opened); b. Plaintiff Sharon Blackstone's case be severed and transferred to the Philadelphia Division of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2317-S Opened); c. Plaintiff Matthew Chapman's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2318-S Opened); d. Plaintiff Ricky Cole's case be severed and transferred to the Pikeville Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2319-S Opened); e. Plaintiff Duane Fielder's c ase be severed and transferred to the Reno Division of the District of Nevada (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2320-S Opened);f. Plaintiff Stanley Green's case be severed and transferred to the Harrisburg Division of the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2321-S Opened); g. Plaintiff Kimberly McCray's case be severed and transferred to the Springfield Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2322-S Opened); h. Plaintiff Lucille Tisdale's case be severed and transferred to the Springfield Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2323-S Opened);i. Plaintiff Kelly Warner's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2324-S Opened). Plaintiff Dora Sirmons is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/18/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Resp/Reply filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Przybysz, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 12 replaced to flatten image on 6/17/2020) (dsr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Becton, Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) Modified corporate parent on 6/12/2020 (mla). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/10/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10903783) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corp, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackstone v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: JESSICA NATALI
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R BARD INC
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: JESSICA NATALI
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Blackstone
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: ERIC M. PRZYBYSZ
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: STEVEN S. SCHULTE
Represented By: JOSHUA M. MANKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?