TWARDZIK v. DEVERO
Plaintiff: JASON TWARDZIK
Defendant: OFFICER ELLIS DEVERO
Case Number: 2:2020cv04105
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by PRO SE PLFF JASON TWARDZIK. "ENVELOPE ATTACHED"(kw, )
September 15, 2020 Copy of #4 Order mailed to Pro Se. (mas, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by PRO SE PLFF JASON TWARDZIK. "ENVELOPE ATTACHED"(kw, )
September 8, 2020 1 Summons Issued as to ELLIS DEVERO. Forwarded To: U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE on 9/8/20 (jpd, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE A SUMMONS FOR THE DEFENDANT. AS TWARDZIK IS CURRENTLY INCARCERATED IN NORTH CAROLINA, SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE MADE UPON THE DEFENDANT BY THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. TWARDZIK WILL BE REQUIRED TO COMPLETE A USM-285 FORM SO THAT THE MARSHALS CAN SERVE THE DEFENDANT. FAILURE TO COMPLETE THAT FORM MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE. IN THE EVENT A SUMMONS IS RETURNED UNEXECUTED, IT IS TWARDZIKS RESPONSIBILITY TO ASK THE CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE AN ALIAS SUMMONS AND TO PROVIDE THE CLERK WITH THE DEFENDANTS CORRECT ADDRESS, SO SERVICE CAN BE MADE. THE PARTIES SHOULD NOTIFY THE CLERKS OFFICE WHEN THERE IS AN ADDRESS CHANGE. FAILURE TO DO SO COULD RESULT IN COURT ORDERS OR OTHER INFORMATION NOT BEING TIMELY DELIVERED, WHICH COULD AFFECT THE PARTIES LEGAL RIGHTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/8/20. 9/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
August 31, 2020 Document #2 together with Blank copy of Court's current standard pro se form to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se plff.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED THAT IF TWARDZIK SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY $400 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT (OR INSTITUTIONAL EQUIVALENT) SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED FOR THE SIX-MONTH PERIOD FROM FEBRUARY 17, 2020 THROUGH AUGUST 17, 2020, REFLECTING ACCOUNT ACTIVITY FROM THAT TIME PERIOD. IF TWARDZIK IS ULTIMATELY GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE WILL BE OBLIGATED TO PAY THE $350 FILING FEE IN INSTALLMENTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(B), EVEN IF HIS CASE IS DISMISSED. HE WILL NOT BE ENTITLED TO THE RETURN OF ANY PAYMENTS MADE TOWARD THE FEE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH TWARDZIK WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORMS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. TWARDZIK MAY USE THIS FORM TO SEEK LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IF HE CANNOT AFFORD TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE. IF TWARDZIK FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 8/31/20. 8/31/20 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER AND FORMS NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER(jpd, ) Modified on 8/31/2020 (jpd, ).
August 26, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE218224 (dmc, )
August 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JASON TWARDZIK. (fdc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELLIS DEVERO, filed by JASON TWARDZIK. (NO FEE, NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TWARDZIK v. DEVERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON TWARDZIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ELLIS DEVERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?