HATCHIGIAN et al v. CARRIER CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: JOAN RANDAZZO and DAVID HATCHIGIAN
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION and PEIRCE-PHELPS
Case Number: 2:2020cv04110
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CARRIER CORPORATION.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PEIRCE-PHELPS.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(RYAN, JAMES)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION (SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Letter dated 9/28/2020 by DAVID HATCHIGIAN (sg, )
September 14, 2020 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #5 WITH ECF FORMS TO PLAINTIFFS' ON 9/14/20. (jaa, ) Modified on 9/14/2020 (jaa, ).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ACCESS TO EMAIL #3 IS GRANTED. THE PRO SE PLAINTIFFS, DAVID HATCHIGIAN AND JOAN RANDAZZO MAY REGISTER AS ECF FILING USERS IN THE ECF SYSTEM, SOLELY FOR THE PURPOSE OF LITIGATING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FORWARD A COPY OF THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (ECF) ACCOUNT REGISTRATION FORM TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF, DAVID HATCHIGIAN AT 2414 TOWNSHIP LINE ROAD, HAVERTOWN, PA. 19083, AND PRO SE PLAINTIFF, JOAN RANDAZZO AT 2414 TOWNSHIP LINE ROAD, HAVERTOWN, PA. 19083. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/11/20. 9/11/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO RANDAZZO. (fdc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Letter dated 9/8/20 by DAVID HATCHIGIAN (fdc, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Letter dated 8/25/20 by DAVID HATCHIGIAN (mbh, )
August 26, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE218223 (dmc, )
August 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to CARRIER CORPORATION, PEIRCE-PHELPS. EMAILED To: PLAINTIFF on 8/24/20 (jaa, )
August 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DAVID HATCHIGIAN, JOAN RANDAZZO. (JL )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jaa, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARRIER CORPORATION, PEIRCE-PHELPS (Filing fee $ 400.) filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN, JOAN RANDAZZO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HATCHIGIAN et al v. CARRIER CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEIRCE-PHELPS
Represented By: JAMES F. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN RANDAZZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HATCHIGIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?