HEIL TRAILER v. XL RISK CONSULTANTS, INC.
Plaintiff: HEIL TRAILER doing business as KALYN SIEBERT
Defendant: XL RISK CONSULTANTS, INC. and XL RISK CONSULTING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04120
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HEIL TRAILER. XL RISK CONSULTING, INC. waiver sent on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (PISANO, MATTHEW)
August 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to XL RISK CONSULTING, INC.. Forwarded To: Matthew T. Pisano on 8/24/20 (fdc, )
August 21, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HEIL TRAILER. (JL )
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HEIL TRAILER.(PISANO, MATTHEW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XL RISK CONSULTANTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14512779.), filed by HEIL TRAILER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(PISANO, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEIL TRAILER v. XL RISK CONSULTANTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL RISK CONSULTANTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL RISK CONSULTING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEIL TRAILER doing business as KALYN SIEBERT
Represented By: MATTHEW T. PISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?