1600 Walnut Corporation, General Partner of L-A 1600 Walnut LP v. Cole Haan Company Store
Plaintiff: 1600 Walnut Street Corporation, General Partner of L-A Walnut LP and 1600 Walnut Corporation, General Partner of L-A 1600 Walnut LP
Defendant: Cole Haan Company Store
Case Number: 2:2020cv04223
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 1600 Walnut Corporation, General Partner of L-A 1600 Walnut LP.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY R. TWARDOWSKI on behalf of 1600 Walnut Corporation, General Partner of L-A 1600 Walnut LP with Certificate of Service(TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY A. DEVITO on behalf of 1600 Walnut Corporation, General Partner of L-A 1600 Walnut LP with Certificate of Service(DEVITO, GARY)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE rescheduled FOR 10/28/2020 at 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER.(sc, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/14/2020 at 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER.(sc, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint together with and Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against 1600 Walnut Corporation, General Partner of L-A 1600 Walnut LP by Cole Haan Company Store. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service of Answer and Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(MOFFITT, DAVID)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME IN WHICH DEFENDANT MUST RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, IS EXTENDED BY TWENTY (20) DAYS UP TO AND INCLUDING SEPTEMBER 21, 2020. THIS IS THE FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 9/3/20. 9/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Cole Haan Company Store. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Stipulation for Extension)(MOFFITT, DAVID) Modified on 9/9/2020 (tjd).
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by 1600 Walnut Corporation, General Partner of L-A 1600 Walnut LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LANGE, KIERSTIN)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THIS CASE IS THE HONORABLE LINDA K. CARACAPPA. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/31/20. 8/31/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cole Haan, LLC with Certificate of Service by Cole Haan Company Store. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MOFFITT, DAVID)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cole Haan Company Store , Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, case number 200701182, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14526911), filed by Cole Haan Company Store. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Supplement Exhibit A, #6 Supplement Exhibit B)(MOFFITT, DAVID) Modified on 8/28/2020 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1600 Walnut Corporation, General Partner of L-A 1600 Walnut LP v. Cole Haan Company Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1600 Walnut Street Corporation, General Partner of L-A Walnut LP
Represented By: KIERSTIN MARIE LANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1600 Walnut Corporation, General Partner of L-A 1600 Walnut LP
Represented By: KIERSTIN MARIE LANGE
Represented By: GARY A. DEVITO
Represented By: ANTHONY R. TWARDOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Haan Company Store
Represented By: DAVID R. MOFFITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?