TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. v. AZAR II et al
Plaintiff: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA, ALEX M. AZAR, II and ROBERT G EATON
Case Number: 2:2020cv04533
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph D. Glazer, #2 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Undispted Material Facts, #3 Certificate of Service)(GLAZER, JOSEPH)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. Brief, Statement of undisputed Facts, Declarations, Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration Michael Young, #3 Exhibit Young Declaration 1-5, #4 Exhibit Young Declaration 6, #5 Declaration Joseph Glazer, #6 Exhibit Glazer Declaration 1-2)(GLAZER, JOSEPH) Modified on 10/19/2020 (tjd).
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE AS FOLLOWS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/1/20. 10/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA with Certificate of Service(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
September 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/18/2020 (bw, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC..(GLAZER, JOSEPH)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G EATON, SEEMA VERMA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14568606.), filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GLAZER, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. v. AZAR II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH DAVID GLAZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA
Represented By: LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT G EATON
Represented By: LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?