MERTENS v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JAMES MERTENS
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., SYNCHRONY BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC, PRA GROUP, INC., SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P., DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, CHASE BANK USA, N.A., AMERICAN EXPRESS and PORTFOLIO RECOVERY & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04599
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Document #36 mailed to unrep parties. (kw, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against AMERICAN EXPRESS, CHASE BANK USA, N.A., DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PORTFOLIO RECOVERY & ASSOCIATES, LLC, PRA GROUP, INC., SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P., SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P., SYNCHRONY BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC, filed by JAMES MERTENS.(VULLINGS, BRENT)
November 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN EXPRESS, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY & ASSOCIATES, LLC, SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P. AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ON 11/16/20. (rf, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 37 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EXPRESS, CHASE BANK USA, N.A., DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PORTFOLIO RECOVERY & ASSOCIATES, LLC, SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P., SYNCHRONY BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC, filed by JAMES MERTENS., JURY TRIAL DEMAND.(rf, ) Modified on 11/16/2020 (rf, ).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/16/20. 11/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 9, 2020 DOC. 35 MAILED TO UNREPS. (sg, ) Modified on 11/10/2020 (lisad, ).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 33), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN. DEFENDANT DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 16, 2020 TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/5/2020. 11/6/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
November 5, 2020 Default Entered (sg, )
November 5, 2020 DEFAULT BY AMERICAN EXPRESS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (sg, )
November 5, 2020 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES. *FOR PDF SEE DOC. #32 * (lisad, )
November 5, 2020 Copy of Order/Notice dated 10/6/2020 (Document # 16) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to AMERICAN EXPRESS for the following reason: RETURN TO SENDER, NOT DELIEVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. (sg, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 34 Request for Default JAMES MERTENS against AMERICAN EXPRESS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A)(VULLINGS, BRENT)
November 5, 2020 DOC. 31 MAILED TO UNREPS. (sg, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 33 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint filed by DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES..(LAMBA, ADRIA) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 11/6/2020 (lisad, ).
November 5, 2020 Filing 32 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES.(LAMBA, ADRIA)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/2/2020 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/3/2020. 11/3/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by JAMES MERTENS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(VULLINGS, BRENT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, affirmative defenses, certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with Certificate of Service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
October 13, 2020 Mailed Order Doc. #25 to unreps. (er, ) Modified on 10/14/2020 (lisad, ).
October 13, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS. PRA GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
October 9, 2020 Filing 26 FILED IN ERROR, REFILED IN CORRECT CASE.(sg, ) Modified on 10/9/2020 (sg, ). (Main Document 26 replaced on 10/9/2020) (sg, ).
October 9, 2020 FILED ERROR, REFILED IN CORRECT CASE. (sg, ) Modified on 10/9/2020 (sg, ).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT EQUIFAX'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT EQUIFAX SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 12, 2020 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/9/2020.10/9/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. with Certificate of Service by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(REILLY, JESSICA)
October 9, 2020 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(REILLY, JESSICA)
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA REILLY on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(REILLY, JESSICA)
October 8, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY & ASSOCIATES, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
October 8, 2020 COPIES OF ORDER #20 MAILED TO UNREPS. (fdc)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR CHASE BANK USA, N.A. TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS DUE 11/2/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/8/2020. 10/8/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNY PERKINS on behalf of CHASE BANK USA, N.A. with Certificate of Service(PERKINS, JENNY)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including JPMorgan Chase & Co. with Certificate of Service by CHASE BANK USA, N.A..(CAROBUS, ANDREW)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. CAROBUS on behalf of CHASE BANK USA, N.A. with Certificate of Service(CAROBUS, ANDREW)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT SYNCHRONY SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 3, 2020 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/6/2020.10/6/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Synchrony Financial with Certificate of Service by SYNCHRONY BANK.(WEIKEL, JAMES)
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by SYNCHRONY BANK.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WEIKEL, JAMES)
October 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN EXPRESS, CHASE BANK USA, N.A., CHASE BANK USA, N.A., DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PORTFOLIO RECOVERY & ASSOCIATES, LLC, SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P., SYNCHRONY BANK. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 10/1/2020 (sg, )
October 1, 2020 DOC. 13 MAILED TO UNREPS. (sg, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF SUSAN R. SHAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 9/30/2020. 9/30/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(sg, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susan R. Shan, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14603370.). (GREEN, CASEY)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EXPRESS, CHASE BANK USA, N.A., DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PRA GROUP, INC., SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P., SYNCHRONY BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC, filed by JAMES MERTENS.(VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS re: Mark Gascon served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS re: George Covert served Summons and Complaint upon CHASE BANK USA, N.A. by personal service. CHASE BANK USA, N.A. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS re: Diamond Channds served Summons and Complaint upon DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES by personal service. DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS. TRANS UNION, LLC waiver sent on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS re: Randall Brown served Summons and Complaint upon SYNCHRONY BANK by personal service. SYNCHRONY BANK served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS re: Elijah White served Summons and Complaint upon AMERICAN EXPRESS by personal service. AMERICAN EXPRESS served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS re: Christopher Todd Horton served Summons and Complaint upon EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by personal service. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES MERTENS. SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P. waiver sent on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN EXPRESS, CHASE BANK USA, N.A., DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PRA GROUP, INC., SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P., SYNCHRONY BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/21/2020 (bw, ) Modified on 9/22/2020 (lisad, ).
September 18, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAMES MERTENS. (lisad, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EXPRESS, CHASE BANK USA, N.A., DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PRA GROUP, INC., SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P., SYNCHRONY BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14577001.), filed by JAMES MERTENS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERTENS v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MERTENS
Represented By: BRENT F. VULLINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNCHRONY BANK
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS WEIKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: CASEY GREEN
Represented By: SUSAN R. SHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES
Represented By: ADRIA LAMBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: JESSICA REILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK USA, N.A.
Represented By: JENNY PERKINS
Represented By: ANDREW M. CAROBUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?