SINGLETARY v. TRANSAM TRUCKING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CHERYL SINGLETARY
Defendant: TRANSAM TRUCKING, INC. and JUNIOR BARRETT
Case Number: 2:2020cv04744
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/16/2020.11/16/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathlyn Gorman filed by TRANSAM TRUCKING, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(STEWART, GARY)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/10/2020.11/10/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathlyn Gorman filed by TRANSAM TRUCKING, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STEWART, GARY)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK FRANCIS COLEMAN on behalf of TRANSAM TRUCKING, INC. with Certificate of Service(COLEMAN, PATRICK)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by TRANSAM TRUCKING, INC..(STEWART, GARY)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by certified mail re: served Summons and Complaint upon TransAm Trucking, Inc. by certified mail on October 6, 2020 (LORD, JOHN)
September 25, 2020 Case Eligible for Arbitration(lisad, )
September 25, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHERYL SINGLETARY. (lisad, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14594712.), filed by CHERYL SINGLETARY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(LORD, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SINGLETARY v. TRANSAM TRUCKING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSAM TRUCKING, INC.
Represented By: PATRICK FRANCIS COLEMAN
Represented By: GARY N. STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUNIOR BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL SINGLETARY
Represented By: JOHN A. LORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?