BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.
Plaintiff: GENERAL BUILDING CONTRACTORS' ASSOCIATION, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL LABORERS' EMPLOYERS COOPERATION AND EDUCATION TRUST, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL EDUCATION AND TRAINING/ APPRENTICESHIP, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, ALAN R. PARHAM, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL PREPAID LEGAL SERVICES FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL LABORERS-EMPLOYERS COOPERATION AND EDUCATION TRUST, THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL PREPAID LEGAL SERVICES FUND, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL EDUCATION AND TRAINING/ APPRENTICESHIP FUND, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL REGIONAL, STATE AND LOCAL HEALTH AND SAFETY FUND, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL OF THE METROPOLITAN AREA OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY, LABORERS' INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA and BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL EDUCATION AND TRAINING/ APPRENTICESHIP FUND
Defendant: CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04799
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Curtis Lizenbaum re: served Summons and Complaint upon Angela Edwards by Personal on 11/04/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BELLO, MARIELLEN)
October 6, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE219722 (dmc, ) *FILED IN ERROR; DUPLICATE ENTRY* Modified on 10/9/2020 (lisad, ).
October 6, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE219722 (dmc, )
October 6, 2020 Document #3 mailed to unrep party. (kw, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE RICHARD A. LLORET.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/2/2020. 10/2/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sg, ) Modified on 10/5/2020 (lisad, ).
September 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/30/2020 (bw, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GENERAL BUILDING CONTRACTORS' ASSOCIATION.(bw, ) Modified on 10/1/2020 (bw, ).
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC. (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by ALAN R. PARHAM, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL EDUCATION AND TRAINING/ APPRENTICESHIP, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL REGIONAL, STATE AND LOCAL HEALTH AND SAFETY FUND, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL PREPAID LEGAL SERVICES FUND, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL PREPAID LEGAL SERVICES FUND, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL LABORERS' EMPLOYERS COOPERATION AND EDUCATION TRUST, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL LABORERS-EMPLOYERS COOPERATION AND EDUCATION TRUST, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL, GENERAL BUILDING CONTRACTORS' ASSOCIATION, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL EDUCATION AND TRAINING/ APPRENTICESHIP FUND, LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL BUILDING CONTRACTORS' ASSOCIATION
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL LABORERS' EMPLOYERS COOPERATION AND EDUCATION TRUST
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL EDUCATION AND TRAINING/ APPRENTICESHIP
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN R. PARHAM
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL PREPAID LEGAL SERVICES FUND
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL LABORERS-EMPLOYERS COOPERATION AND EDUCATION TRUST
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL PREPAID LEGAL SERVICES FUND
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL EDUCATION AND TRAINING/ APPRENTICESHIP FUND
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL REGIONAL, STATE AND LOCAL HEALTH AND SAFETY FUND
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL OF THE METROPOLITAN AREA OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY, LABORERS' INTERNATIONAL UNION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS' DISTRICT COUNCIL EDUCATION AND TRAINING/ APPRENTICESHIP FUND
Represented By: MARIELLEN BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?