County of Suffolk v. Actavis Holdco US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: County of Suffolk
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., PLIVA, INC., MYLAN INC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, Rising Pharma Holdings, Inc., TELIGENT INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC., DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, WEST--WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, APOTEX CORP., CITRON PHARMA LLC, BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, PERRIGO NEW YORK INC., Mayne Pharma USA Inc., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC, Dr Reddys Laboratories, Inc., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, Inc Pfizer, GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., GREENSTONE LLC, MALLINCKRODT INC, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. and Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04893
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04009. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2020 Case transferred to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13) Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of August 5, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Cynthia M. Rufe. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13) Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of August 5, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Cynthia M. Rufe.. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Holdco US, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Apotex Corp., Ascend Laboratories, LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Bausch Health US, LLC, Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Citron Pharma LLC, Dava Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Dr Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Endo International PLC, Fougera Pharmaceuticals Inc., G&W Laboratories, Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Greenstone LLC, Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lannett Company, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mayne Pharma USA Inc., Mutual Pharmaceutical Company, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Perrigo New York, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Pliva, Inc., Rising Pharma Holdings, Inc., Rising Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teligent, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Wockhardt USA LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by County of Suffolk (Calcaterra, Regina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on each summons does not match the caption of the complaint; specifically, the caption should read the defendants name, "et al" with an attached rider; The "To:" section can be left as "See attached Rider". the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Cubano, Jazmin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by County of Suffolk (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons, #16 Proposed Summons, #17 Proposed Summons, #18 Proposed Summons, #19 Proposed Summons, #20 Proposed Summons, #21 Proposed Summons, #22 Proposed Summons, #23 Proposed Summons, #24 Proposed Summons, #25 Proposed Summons, #26 Proposed Summons, #27 Proposed Summons, #28 Proposed Summons, #29 Proposed Summons, #30 Proposed Summons, #31 Proposed Summons, #32 Proposed Summons, #33 Proposed Summons, #34 Proposed Summons, #35 Proposed Summons, #36 Proposed Summons, #37 Proposed Summons, #38 Proposed Summons, #39 Proposed Summons, #40 Proposed Summons, #41 Proposed Summons, #42 Proposed Summons, #43 Proposed Summons, #44 Proposed Summons, #45 Proposed Summons) (Calcaterra, Regina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/2/2020. (Disbrow, Sandra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: The caption on the summonses do not match the caption as it appears on the complaint. If there are multiple parties that do not fit, you must attach a rider with the full caption. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Defendant was added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendant. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by County of Suffolk (Calcaterra, Regina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Janine Lee Pollack on behalf of County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Pollack, Janine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Milton Liskow on behalf of County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Liskow, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
August 27, 2020 FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13278580 (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by County of Suffolk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 9/1/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Suffolk v. Actavis Holdco US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rising Pharma Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUTUAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST--WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayne Pharma USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Reddys Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Suffolk
Represented By: REGINA MARIE CALCATERRA
Represented By: JANINE LEE POLLACK
Represented By: MICHAEL MILTON LISKOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?