CALVARY LOGISTICS v. ARTUR LOGISTICS CORP.
Plaintiff: CALVARY LOGISTICS
Defendant: ARTUR LOGISTICS CORP.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04901
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:11707
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY RICE FOR SETTLEMENT. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 1/13/2021., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 2/26/2021., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 1/13/2021., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/24/2021 10:00 AM; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/12/2021., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/12/2021., TRIAL DATE SET FOR 3/30/2021 09:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/16/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 Affirmative Defenses AND ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM by CALVARY LOGISTICS. (SANDLER, PAUL)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of BUCKS County. (afm, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PARTIES STIPULATON FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM NO LATER THAN 11/19/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/29/20. 10/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COUNTER-CLAIM by CALVARY LOGISTICS. (SANDLER, PAUL)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/13/2020. 10/13/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND, COUNTERCLAIM against CALVARY LOGISTICS by ARTUR LOGISTICS CORP..(GALATI, STEPHEN)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ARTUR LOGISTICS CORP. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14613443), filed by ARTUR LOGISTICS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(GALATI, STEPHEN) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/6/2020) (md, ). Modified on 10/6/2020 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALVARY LOGISTICS v. ARTUR LOGISTICS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVARY LOGISTICS
Represented By: PAUL N. SANDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTUR LOGISTICS CORP.
Represented By: STEPHEN J. GALATI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?