SMITH v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD SMITH
Defendant: TRANS UNION L.L.C. and WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04903
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (DKT. NO. 27) OF DAVID M. GETTINGS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/3/20.12/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14753221.) filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A...(HUTCHINSON, JENNA)
December 2, 2020 Filing 26 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting Proposed Discovery Plan by TRANS UNION L.L.C. (NAUM, NICHOLAS) Modified on 12/3/2020 (tjd).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (DKT. NO. 24) OF DENNIS MCCARTY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/25/20.11/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
November 24, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Dennis McCarty ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14736845.) filed by CLIFFORD SMITH..(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
November 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW B. WEISBERG on behalf of CLIFFORD SMITH with Certificate of Service(WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
November 24, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY SCHAFKOPF on behalf of CLIFFORD SMITH with Certificate of Service(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED VIA TELEPHONE FOR 12/7/20 AT 9:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/16/20. 11/16/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(HUTCHINSON, JENNA) Modified on 11/18/2020 (tjd).
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION L.L.C..(NAUM, NICHOLAS)
October 14, 2020 PLEADING #18 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND IS EXTENDED TO 11/13/2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/13/2020. 10/13/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS.(sg, )
October 13, 2020 Document #15 mailed to counsel. (kw, )
October 8, 2020 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent WELLS FARGO & COMPANY for WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.**(REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT, SEE DOCUMENT #17 FOR ORIGINAL FILING AND PDF)**.(tjd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement 7.1 re: Financial Interest Disclosure by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (HUTCHINSON, JENNA) Modified on 10/9/2020 (tjd).
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 /Stipulation for Extension by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**. (HUTCHINSON, JENNA) Modified on 10/9/2020 (tjd).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (DKT. NO. 13) OF NICHOLAS C. NAUM, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. LOCAL COUNSEL AND PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO JUDGE KENNEYS PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES AND ARE FURTHER DIRECTED TO PAY ATTENTION SPECIFICALLY TO COURT APPEARANCES AND THE GUIDELINE AS TO RULE 16 CONFERENCES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/8/20. 10/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION L.L.C..(GREEN, CASEY)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas C. Naum, Esquire by TRANS UNION L.L.C.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14624537.). (GREEN, CASEY)
October 7, 2020 COPY OF ORDER #12 MAILED TO ATTY. (fdc)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/7/20. 10/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-00982. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORRECTIVE ORDER on Motion to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania forthwith. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/29/20. (lck) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania forthwith. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/28/20. (lck) Modified on 9/29/2020 - See correct order at doc no #10 (lck). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania by CLIFFORD SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Raburn, Jonathan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CLIFFORD SMITH. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Raburn, Jonathan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CLIFFORD SMITH. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Raburn, Jonathan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to TRANS UNION, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 summons) (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CLIFFORD SMITH (Attachments: #1 Summons Wells Fargo Summons, #2 Summons Trans Union Summons) (Raburn, Jonathan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/6/20. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRANS UNION, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5698600), filed by CLIFFORD SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION L.L.C.
Represented By: CASEY GREEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS C. NAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: DAVID M. GETTINGS
Represented By: JENNA C. HUTCHINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD SMITH
Represented By: JONATHAN RABURN
Represented By: DENNIS DEAN MCCARTY
Represented By: GARY SCHAFKOPF
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?