TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY v. HENTRICH et al
Plaintiff: TRUSTGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY and TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MARK LAFLER, KENNETH HENTRICH, MICHAEL TIDABACK, COMCAST SPECTACOR, LEN SAMMONS MOTORSPORTS, LLC, RENEE TIDABACK, LAFLER CHASSIS, LLC, LEN SAMMONS PRODUCTIONS, NEW JERSEY CASINO REINVESTMENT DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY and LEN SAMMONS
Case Number: 2:2020cv04931
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by KENNETH HENTRICH.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order Motion for More Definite Statement, #4 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, MATTHEW)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW A. GOLDSTEIN on behalf of KENNETH HENTRICH with Certificate of Service(GOLDSTEIN, MATTHEW)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE M. EPSTEIN on behalf of KENNETH HENTRICH with Certificate of Service(EPSTEIN, LEE)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served summons upon Lafler Chassis, LLC by process server on 10/21/2020 (CAVALIER, ROBERT)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served summons upon Mark Lafler by process server on 10/21/2020 (CAVALIER, ROBERT)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served summons upon NJ Casino Reinvestment Development Authority by process server on 10/20/2020 (CAVALIER, ROBERT)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served summons upon Kenneth Hentrich by process server on 10/13/2020 (CAVALIER, ROBERT)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served summons and first amended complaint upon Renee Tidaback by process server on 10/17/2020 (CAVALIER, ROBERT)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served summons and first amended complaint upon Michael Tidaback by process server on 10/17/2020 (CAVALIER, ROBERT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served summons upon Len Sammons by process server on 10/8/2020 (CAVALIER, ROBERT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served summons upon Len Sammons Productions by process server on 10/8/2020 (CAVALIER, ROBERT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Summons upon Len Sammons Motorsports,LLC by process server on 10/8/2020 (CAVALIER, ROBERT)
October 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to COMCAST SPECTACOR, KENNETH HENTRICH, MARK LAFLER, LAFLER CHASSIS, LLC, LEN SAMMONS MOTORSPORTS, LLC, LEN SAMMONS PRODUCTIONS, NEW JERSEY CASINO REINVESTMENT DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY, LEN SAMMONS, MICHAEL TIDABACK, RENEE TIDABACK EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ON 10/13/20 (rf, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against COMCAST SPECTACOR, KENNETH HENTRICH, MARK LAFLER, LAFLER CHASSIS, LLC, LEN SAMMONS MOTORSPORTS, LLC, LEN SAMMONS PRODUCTIONS, NEW JERSEY CASINO REINVESTMENT DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY, LEN SAMMONS, MICHAEL TIDABACK, RENEE TIDABACK, filed by TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY.(CAVALIER, ROBERT) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/9/2020, per chambers approval) (md, ). Modified on 10/9/2020 (md, ).
October 7, 2020 Summons Issued as to COMCAST SPECTACOR, KENNETH HENTRICH, MARK LAFLER, LAFLER CHASSIS, LLC, LEN SAMMONS MOTORSPORTS, LLC, LEN SAMMONS PRODUCTIONS, NEW JERSEY CASINO REINVESTMENT DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY, LEN SAMMONS, MICHAEL TIDABACK, RENEE TIDABACK. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/7/2020 (bw, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMCAST SPECTACOR, KENNETH HENTRICH, MARK LAFLER, LAFLER CHASSIS, LLC, LEN SAMMONS MOTORSPORTS, LLC, LEN SAMMONS PRODUCTIONS, NEW JERSEY CASINO REINVESTMENT DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY, LEN SAMMONS, MICHAEL TIDABACK, RENEE TIDABACK ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14618139.), filed by TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(CAVALIER, ROBERT) Modified on 10/9/2020 (md, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/9/2020, per chambers approval) (md, ). Modified on 10/9/2020 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY v. HENTRICH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK LAFLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH HENTRICH
Represented By: LEE M. EPSTEIN
Represented By: MATTHEW A. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL TIDABACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMCAST SPECTACOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEN SAMMONS MOTORSPORTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE TIDABACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAFLER CHASSIS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEN SAMMONS PRODUCTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY CASINO REINVESTMENT DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEN SAMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT M. CAVALIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT M. CAVALIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?