Centene Corporation et al v. Indivior Inc. et al
Plaintiff: WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS, INC., Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation doing business as Fidelis Care and CENTENE CORPORATION
Defendant: INDIVIOR INC., AQUESTIVE THERAPEUTICS, INC., INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC., INDIVIOR PLC, MONOSOL RX, LLC, RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD., RECKITT BENCKISER GROUP PLC and RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS SOLUTIONS INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05014
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT MOTIONS TO DISMISS MAY BE FILED NO LATER THAN 1/15/21 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/18/20. 11/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 11/18/2020 (rf, ).
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order COPIES OF ORDER #28 MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL. (fdc)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE by AQUESTIVE THERAPEUTICS, INC., INDIVIOR INC., INDIVIOR PLC, INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC., RECKITT BENCKISER GROUP PLC, RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD. re Letter from J. Berman dated 11/17/2020 Regarding Motions to Dismiss (BERMAN, JONATHAN)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to AQUESTIVE THERAPEUTICS, INC., INDIVIOR INC., INDIVIOR PLC, INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC., RECKITT BENCKISER GROUP PLC and RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD. E- counsel on 10/23/20 (mbh, )
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Request for Summons by CENTENE CORPORATION, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS, INC.. (SASSE, DANIEL)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON on behalf of INDIVIOR INC., INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC. with Certificate of Service(LIPSCOMB-JACKSON, TIFFANY)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC..(BERMAN, JONATHAN)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INDIVIOR INC..(BERMAN, JONATHAN)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN BERMAN on behalf of INDIVIOR INC., INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC. with Certificate of Service(BERMAN, JONATHAN)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-01289. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER (CTO-4) to: Eastern District of Pennsylvania In re: Suboxone (Buprenorphine Hydrochloride And Naloxone) Antitrust Litigation --- Case electronically transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (MRC) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) REGARDING MDL NO. 2445 IN RE: SUBOXONE (BUPRENORPHINE HYDROCHLORIDE AND NALOXONE) ANTITRUST LITIGATION Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 , #15 are GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 09/28/20. (MCC) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, WellCare Health Plans, Inc. re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tiffanie L. McDowell. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8171508), #16 Notice (Other), #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sima NamiriKalantari. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8171907) re Certificate of Service (Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, WellCare Health Plans, Inc. of Filing in the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of Plaintiffs Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action)(Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sima NamiriKalantari. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8171907) by Plaintiffs Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, WellCare Health Plans, Inc.. (Namiri-Kalantari, Sima) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tiffanie L. McDowell. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8171508) by Plaintiffs Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, WellCare Health Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CBL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, WellCare Health Plans, Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 is GRANTED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 09/23/20. (MCC) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel A. Sasse. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number CMOEDC-8162946) by Plaintiffs Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, WellCare Health Plans, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 , #7 are GRANTED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 09/22/20. (MCC) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, Wellcare Health Plans, Inc. - Certificate of Service (Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Keith J. Harrison. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8159360) by Plaintiffs Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, Wellcare Health Plans, Inc.. (Harrison, Keith) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kent A. Gardiner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8159357) by Plaintiffs Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC, New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, Wellcare Health Plans, Inc.. (Gardiner, Kent) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 6. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. (BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Health Net, LLC. Parent companies: Centene Corporation,. (Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff New York Quality Healthcare Corporation. Parent companies: Centene Corporation,. (Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Wellcare Health Plans, Inc.. Parent companies: Centene Corporation,. (Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Centene Corporation.. (Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number BMOEDC-8159266, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by New York Quality Healthcare Corporation, Wellcare Health Plans, Inc., Centene Corporation, Health Net, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4.9.2019 Grand Jury Indictment, #2 Exhibit 2 - 8.14.2019 Grand Jury Superseding Indictment, #3 Exhibit 3 - 6.30.2020 Thaxter Criminal Information, #4 Exhibit 4 - 8.31.2020 Baxter Criminal Information, #5 Exhibit 5 - 7.24.2020 Indivior Solutions Criminal Information, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form, #8 Waiver of Service Indivior Inc. f/k/a Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Inc., #9 Waiver of Service Indivior Solutions Inc. f/k/a Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc., #10 Waiver of Service Indivior plc, #11 Waiver of Service Reckitt Benckiser Group plc, #12 Waiver of Service Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Ltd., #13 Waiver of Service Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. f/k/a Monosol Rx, LLC)(Sasse, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centene Corporation et al v. Indivior Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIVIOR INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUESTIVE THERAPEUTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIVIOR PLC
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONOSOL RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECKITT BENCKISER GROUP PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECKITT BENCKISER PHARMACEUTICALS SOLUTIONS INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY D. LIPSCOMB-JACKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANIE L. MCDOWELL
Represented By: DANIEL A. SASSE
Represented By: SIMA NAMIRI-KALANTARI
Represented By: KENT A. GARDINER
Represented By: KEITH J HARRISON
Represented By: KEITH J. HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Net, LLC
Represented By: TIFFANIE L. MCDOWELL
Represented By: DANIEL A. SASSE
Represented By: SIMA NAMIRI-KALANTARI
Represented By: KENT A. GARDINER
Represented By: KEITH J HARRISON
Represented By: KEITH J. HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Quality Healthcare Corporation doing business as Fidelis Care
Represented By: TIFFANIE L. MCDOWELL
Represented By: DANIEL A. SASSE
Represented By: SIMA NAMIRI-KALANTARI
Represented By: KENT A. GARDINER
Represented By: KEITH J HARRISON
Represented By: KEITH J. HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTENE CORPORATION
Represented By: TIFFANIE L. MCDOWELL
Represented By: DANIEL A. SASSE
Represented By: SIMA NAMIRI-KALANTARI
Represented By: KENT A. GARDINER
Represented By: KEITH J HARRISON
Represented By: KEITH J. HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?