RIZZO v. NUTANIX, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SAMUEL P. RIZZO
Defendant: PHILLIP SPEAR, MICHAEL GRANIT and NUTANIX, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05140
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR.(HARTIGAN, KALEIGH) Modified on 9/8/2021 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; WRONG CASE)
April 13, 2021 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTERVIDEO Conference held on 3/22/21. (JL )
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS'S MOTION TO DISMISS #10 AND #19 ARE GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR ALL PURPOSES INCLUDING STATISTICS. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3-31-2021. 3-31-2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/31/2021. 3/31/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR. (MARKEY, NINA)
March 26, 2021 Filing 24 Memorandum in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (MACEL, JOSHUA)
March 19, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BRUCE L. BALDWIN on behalf of SAMUEL P. RIZZO(BALDWIN, BRUCE)
March 19, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA DAVID MACEL on behalf of SAMUEL P. RIZZO (MACEL, JOSHUA)
February 23, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM :ORAL ARGUMENT IS SET FOR 3/22/2021 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 20 Memorandum of Law re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Supplemental Brief Regarding Statute of Limitations filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (BALDWIN, BRUCE)
February 19, 2021 Filing 19 DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR. (MARKEY, NINA) Modified on 3/9/2021 (lvj, ).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON THE ISSUE OF WHETHER THE STATUE OF LIMITATIONS PRECLUDES PLAINTIFF'S DEFAMATION CLAIM. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/11/2021. 2/11/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
February 3, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (BALDWIN, BRUCE)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER finding as moot #14 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE/REPLY. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/3/2021.2/3/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE/REPLY RE #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dismiss Complaint RESPONSES DUE BY 2/3/2021.. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/29/2021.1/29/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED ONLY.(sfl, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dismiss Complaint filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO..(BALDWIN, BRUCE)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE L. BALDWIN on behalf of SAMUEL P. RIZZO (BALDWIN, BRUCE)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dismiss Complaint filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO..(BALDWIN, BRUCE)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT MR. RIZZO SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION (DOC. NO.#10) ON OR BY 1/29/21 OR THE COURT MAY CONSIDER THE MOTION (DOC.NO.10) UNOPPOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/7/21. 1/7/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CREUZ, AARON)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part #8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER. THE DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING ON OR BEFORE 12/14/2020. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/3/2020.12/3/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CREUZ, AARON)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by NINA K. MARKEY on behalf of MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR with Certificate of Service(MARKEY, NINA)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON J. CREUZ on behalf of MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR with Certificate of Service(CREUZ, AARON)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAMUEL P. RIZZO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(fdc, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Statement by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (mbh, )
October 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR. Forwarded To: Samuel P. Rizzo on 10/30/20 (fdc, )
October 21, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE220271 (dmc, )
October 21, 2020 DOC. #3 AND IFP FORM MAILED TO PRO SE SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (tomg, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY THE $400 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE PLAINTIFF WITH APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/20/2020. 10/21/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER AND IFP APPLICATION NOT E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF, INVALID EMAIL ADDRESS.(sg, ) Modified on 10/21/2020 (sg, ).
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL GRANIT, NUTANIX, INC., PHILLIP SPEAR, filed by SAMUEL P. RIZZO. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIZZO v. NUTANIX, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP SPEAR
Represented By: NINA K. MARKEY
Represented By: AARON J. CREUZ
Represented By: KALEIGH HARTIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL GRANIT
Represented By: NINA K. MARKEY
Represented By: AARON J. CREUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTANIX, INC.
Represented By: NINA K. MARKEY
Represented By: AARON J. CREUZ
Represented By: KALEIGH HARTIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL P. RIZZO
Represented By: JOSHUA DAVID MACEL
Represented By: BRUCE L. BALDWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?