QUEZADA, et al. v. ARBITERSPORTS, LLC
Plaintiff: VICTOR RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID and KEVIN SCHMID
Defendant: ARBITERSPORTS, LLC
Petitioner: MAURICE HARGROVE
Case Number: 2:2020cv05193
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/6/21 AT 10:00 A.M. THROUGH THE USE OF ZOOM; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 11/23/21. 11/23/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDERED THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON NOVEMBER 30, 2021 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE SCOTT W. REID, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD VIRTUALLY THROUGH THE USE OF ZOOM. A LINK WITH INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO LOG ON WILL BE SENT SEPARATELY FROM THIS ORDER AND CLOSER TO THE ACTUAL CONFERENCE DATE. COUNSEL ARE FURTHER DIRECTED TO COMPLETE THE ENCLOSED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SUMMARY TO BE FAXED OR EMAILED TO CHAMBERS ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 23, 2021. THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SUMMARY COMES AS AN ATTACHMENT TO THIS ORDER FOR ECF SUBSCRIBERS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 11/8/21. 11/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
November 6, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC Regarding Status of Opt-Out Requests (Joint) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gretchen Eoff)(COLLIGNON, CASIE)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDERED THAT THE ISSUE OF ATTORNEYS FEES IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID TO CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/12/21. 10/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/5/21.10/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 47 SURREPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursements of Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Incentive Awards (Surreply) filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Correspondence)(COLLIGNON, CASIE) Modified on 10/7/2021 (tjd).
October 1, 2021 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION to Enforce JOINT RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ENFORCE PAYMENT IN EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC. (COLLIGNON, CASIE)
October 1, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC JOINT NOTICE OF FILING CLASS NOTICE DECLARATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(COLLIGNON, CASIE)
September 28, 2021 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursements of Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Incentive Awards filed by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Scott H. Wolpert, Esquire)(WOLPERT, SCOTT)
September 27, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION TO ENFORCE PAYMENT IN EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES filed by MAURICE HARGROVE..(jaa, )
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME AND/OR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENTS OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE INCENTIVE AWARDS (DOC. NO. 41), IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT: 1. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR REPLY TO THE DEFENDANTS RESPONSE NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 28, 2021. 2. IF DEFENDANT WISHES TO FILE A SURREPLY, IT SHALL DO SO NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 5, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/22/21.9/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE INCENTIVE AWARDS filed by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENTION OF TIME AND/OR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE INCENTIVE AWARDS)(WOLPERT, SCOTT)
September 14, 2021 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursements of Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Incentive Awards filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Casie D. Collignon, #2 Exhibit 1 - Data Incident Notification, #3 Exhibit 2 - Internet Search Results, #4 Exhibit 3 - Email Exchange Regarding Attorneys' Fees, #5 Exhibit 4 - Redline Quezada Class Action Complaint and (5) First Amended Class Action Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Delkener Motion for Final Approval of Class Action, #7 Exhibit 6 - Delkener Order Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement and Judgment, #8 Exhibit 7 - Objections Timoney Knox Billing Statement, #9 Exhibit 8 - Objections to Shub Law Billing Statement, #10 Exhibit 9 - Terms and Conditions - ArbiterSports)(COLLIGNON, CASIE)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE MOTION NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 14, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/10/21. 9/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #37 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursements of Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Incentive Awards filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(COLLIGNON, CASIE)
August 20, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursements of Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Incentive Awards filed by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursements of Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Incentive Awards, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursements of Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Incentive Awards, #3 Exhibit #1 Declaration of Scott H. Wolpert, #4 Exhibit #2 Declaration of Jonathan Shub, #5 Exhibit #3 Identity Guard Privacy Plan, #6 Exhibit #4 Settlement Administration Cost, #7 Exhibit #5 Shub Law Firm, LLC Resume, #8 Exhibit #6 Timoney Knox, LLP Resume, #9 Exhibit #7 Timoney Knox, LLP Billing Statement, #10 Exhibit #8 Shub Law Firm, LLC Billing Statement, #11 Exhibit #9 Declaration of Victor Alfonso Rodriguez Quezada, #12 Exhibit #10 Declaration of Brendan Monaghan, #13 Exhibit #11 Declaration of Kevin Schmid, #14 Exhibit #12 Declaration of John Schmid, #15 Exhibit #13 Timoney Knox, LLP Expenses Statement, #16 Exhibit #14 Shub Law Firm, LLC Expenses Statement)(WOLPERT, SCOTT)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #34 ) IS GRANTED. THE APPEARANCE OF SEAN B. SOLIS AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT IS WITHDRAWN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/26/21.7/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS AND DIRECTING NOTICE (DOCUMENT NO. 28) AND AFTER A HEARING IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/19/21.7/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Sean B. Solis filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Sean B. Solis as Counsel)(COLLIGNON, CASIE)
July 15, 2021 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Show Cause Hearing held on 7/7/21. Court Reporter: SUZANNE R. WHITE. (jaa, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 32 Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement, Provisionally Certifying Settlement Class, and Directing Notice to the Settlement Class filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Form, #3 Exhibit C - Email Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Long Form Notice)(COLLIGNON, CASIE) Modified on 7/19/2021 (tjd).
July 6, 2021 Filing 31 EXHIBIT A Filed Under Seal by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID.**(FILED UNDER SEAL)**. (tjd) (tjd, ).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT EXHIBIT A TO THE PARTIES SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT 1 TO THE PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (DOC. NO. 28, ATTACHMENT 2) SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL AND SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/22/21.6/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Seal - For Leave To File Document Under Seal In Connection With Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement filed by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(WOLPERT, SCOTT)
June 18, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Approval Of An Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement, Provisionally Certifying Settlement Class, And Directing Notice filed by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Their Unopposed Motion For An Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement, Provisionally Certifying Settlement Class, And Directing Notice, #2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement with Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), Exhibit B (Long Form Notice), Exhibit C (Claim Form), Exhibit D (Email Notice), #3 Exhibit Declaration Of Plaintiffs' Counsel In Support Of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For An Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement, Provisionally Certifying Settlement Class, And Directing Notice, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement, Provisionally Certifying Settlement Class, And Directing Notice To The Settlement Class)(WOLPERT, SCOTT)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/27/21.5/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED AS FOLLOWS THAT NO LATER THAN JUNE 18, 2021, PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT; A HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE SETTLEMENT SHOULD NOT BE PRELIMINARILY APPROVED IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, JULY 7, 2021, AT 9:00 A.M., IN COURTROOM 9A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA AND ALL DEADLINES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER OF DECEMBER 22, 2020 ARE STAYED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/18/21. 5/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC of Settlement and Stipulation to Set Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COLLIGNON, CASIE)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED THAT JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES FOR DEPOSITIONS RELATED TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCUMENT NO. 23), IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/8/21.2/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID.Certificate of Service.(WOLPERT, SCOTT)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY BY 2/12/21. THE PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION BY 2/26/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/22/20. 12/22/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
December 22, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE RULE 16 Conference held on 12/22/20. (JL )
December 22, 2020 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines:( DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/12/2021.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint.( RESPONSES DUE BY 2/26/2021.) (JL )
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND KEITH T. VERNON IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE PLAINTIFFS FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (ECF) SYSTEM AND FOLLOW JUDGE SAVAGES POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/4/20.12/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keith T. Vernon filed by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID.Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith T. Vernon in Support of Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Application for Admittance, #3 Exhibit Sponsor's Statement)(WOLPERT, SCOTT)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID. (WOLPERT, SCOTT)
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC.Brief, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Declaration of John Hopkins in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SOLIS, SEAN)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGN TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/8/20. 12/8/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/4/20.12/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND SEAN B. SOLIS IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT ARBITERSPORTS, LLC FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (ECF) SYSTEM AND FOLLOW JUDGE SAVAGES POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/4/20.12/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND CASIE D. COLLIGNON IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT ARBITERSPORTS, LLC FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (ECF) SYSTEM AND FOLLOW JUDGE SAVAGES POLICIES AND PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/4/20.12/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Casie D. Collignon ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14755881.) filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC.Affidavi and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(WANGER, BENJAMIN)
December 3, 2020 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14754742). (WANGER, BENJAMIN)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Sean B. Solis filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WANGER, BENJAMIN)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, DECEMBER 22, 2020, AT 9:00 A.M., IN ROOM 9614, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/2/20. 12/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/2/20.12/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Keith T. Vernon, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14751661.) filed by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID.Certificate of Service.(WOLPERT, SCOTT)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, BRENDAN MONAGHAN, KEVIN SCHMID, JOHN SCHMID. ARBITERSPORTS, LLC waiver sent on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. (WOLPERT, SCOTT)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sean Solis filed by ARBITERSPORTS, LLC.Certificate of Service.(WANGER, BENJAMIN)
November 12, 2020 Summons Issued as to ARBITERSPORTS, LLC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/12/20 (jaa, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARBITERSPORTS, LLC, filed by VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, BRENDAN MONAGHAN, JOHN SCHMID, KEVIN SCHMID.(WOLPERT, SCOTT) Modified on 11/12/2020 (tjd).
October 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to ARBITERSPORTS, LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 10/20/20 (JL )
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14647503), filed by VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA, BRENDAN MONAGHAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(WOLPERT, SCOTT) Modified on 10/20/2020 (tjd). Modified on 10/20/2020 (tjd). Modified on 10/20/2020 (tjd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/20/2020) (tjd, ).
October 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA. (tjd)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN LAUKAITIS on behalf of BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA (LAUKAITIS, KEVIN)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN SHUB on behalf of BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA (SHUB, JONATHAN)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE M. GORDON on behalf of BRENDAN MONAGHAN, VICTOR RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA (GORDON, CHRISTINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUEZADA, et al. v. ARBITERSPORTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA
Represented By: JONATHAN SHUB
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: KEVIN LAUKAITIS
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDAN MONAGHAN
Represented By: JONATHAN SHUB
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: KEVIN LAUKAITIS
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Represented By: KEITH T. VERNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ QUEZADA
Represented By: JONATHAN SHUB
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: KEVIN LAUKAITIS
Represented By: CHRISTINE M. GORDON
Represented By: KEITH T. VERNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SCHMID
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: KEITH T. VERNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN SCHMID
Represented By: SCOTT H. WOLPERT
Represented By: KEITH T. VERNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARBITERSPORTS, LLC
Represented By: SEAN B. SOLIS
Represented By: BENJAMIN D. WANGER
Represented By: CASIE D. COLLIGNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MAURICE HARGROVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?