Barnette et al v. LAWRENCE et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Barnette and Clay D Breece
Defendant: KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR., Frank Dean and Valerie A Arkoosh
Intervenor Defendant: DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE and PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Case Number: 2:2020cv05477
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 44 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #43 Transcript - PDF, 11/16/20 Entered and Copies Emailed. (JL )
November 16, 2020 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of held on 11/4/20, HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE before Judge SAVAGE. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2021. (JL )
November 11, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece As To Complaint(BRETH, THOMAS)
November 9, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Valerie A Arkoosh, Frank Dean, KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HANGLEY, MICHELE)
November 9, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Valerie A Arkoosh, Frank Dean, KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HANGLEY, MICHELE)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY'S AMENDED MOTION TO INTERVENE ARE GRANTED. PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY IS GRANTED LEAVE TO INTERVENE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/4/20.11/6/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT PROPOSED-DEFENDANT MOTION TO INTERVENE IS GRANTED. DEMOCRATIC SERVICES CORPORATION/DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE IS GRANTED LEAVE TO INTERVENE; ETC;. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/4/20.11/6/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/6/20.11/6/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
November 6, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY. (PRATT, A.)
November 5, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece.Motion to Withdraw Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BRETH, THOMAS)
November 5, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS W. KING, III on behalf of Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece (KING, THOMAS)
November 5, 2020 Filing 33 Declaration re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Julia Vahey by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BRETH, THOMAS)
November 5, 2020 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support of the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece. (BRETH, THOMAS)
November 4, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN P. SHUBER on behalf of Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece (SHUBER, JORDAN)
November 4, 2020 Filing 30 Joinder in Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 22) filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY.Certificate of Service.(PRATT, A.) Modified on 11/5/2020 (fb).
November 4, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM R. ROSEMAN on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY with Certificate of Service(ROSEMAN, ADAM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 28 Amended MOTION to Intervene filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY.Amended Brief in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PRATT, A.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Intervene filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY.Brief in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PRATT, A.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by A. MICHAEL PRATT on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY with Certificate of Service(PRATT, A.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (ROGERS, EDWARD)
November 3, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A - Proposed Answer)(ROGERS, EDWARD)
November 3, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD D. ROGERS on behalf of DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE (ROGERS, EDWARD)
November 3, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Valerie A Arkoosh, Frank Dean, KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR. (HANGLEY, MICHELE)
November 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie I. Command ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14687769.) filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE.Certificate of Service.(GRUGAN, TERENCE)
November 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of John Geise ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14687767.) filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE.Certificate of Service.(GRUGAN, TERENCE)
November 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Uzoma N. Nkwonta ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14687765.) filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE.Certificate of Service.(GRUGAN, TERENCE)
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Marc E. Elias ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14687764.) filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE.Certificate of Service.(GRUGAN, TERENCE)
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE GRUGAN on behalf of DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE (GRUGAN, TERENCE)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Shawn Michael Packer by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece. (BRETH, THOMAS)
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Daniel Lewis Cox by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece. (BRETH, THOMAS)
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Jacob Glenn Daniels by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece. (BRETH, THOMAS)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT A HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, 11/4/20 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 15A BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/3/20. 11/3/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 EXHIBIT D and E by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E)(BRETH, THOMAS)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support of the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece. (BRETH, THOMAS)
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Hearing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BRETH, THOMAS)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece re: Brian Daly served Summons and Complaint upon KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR by Accepted by Jerry, Director of Security. KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (BRETH, THOMAS)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD T. ELLIOTT on behalf of Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece (ELLIOTT, RONALD)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS E. BRETH on behalf of Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece (BRETH, THOMAS)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MILTON VELEZ on behalf of Valerie A Arkoosh, Frank Dean, KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR (VELEZ, MILTON)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT WIYGUL on behalf of Valerie A Arkoosh, Frank Dean, KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR with Certificate of Service(WIYGUL, ROBERT)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELE D. HANGLEY on behalf of Valerie A Arkoosh, Frank Dean, KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR with Certificate of Service(HANGLEY, MICHELE)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. ARONCHICK on behalf of Valerie A Arkoosh, Frank Dean, KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR with Certificate of Service(ARONCHICK, MARK)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP W. NEWCOMER on behalf of Valerie A Arkoosh, Frank Dean, KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR (NEWCOMER, PHILIP)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14684736.), filed by Kathy Barnette, Clay D Breece. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX-A, #2 Exhibit EX-B, #3 Exhibit EX-C)(TEITELMAN, ANDREW)
November 3, 2020 Summons Issued as to Valerie A Arkoosh, Frank Dean, KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR. Emailed To: COUNSEL on 11/3/20 (jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnette et al v. LAWRENCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Barnette
Represented By: ANDREW TEITELMAN
Represented By: RONALD T. ELLIOTT
Represented By: THOMAS E. BRETH
Represented By: JORDAN P. SHUBER
Represented By: THOMAS W. KING, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clay D Breece
Represented By: ANDREW TEITELMAN
Represented By: RONALD T. ELLIOTT
Represented By: THOMAS E. BRETH
Represented By: JORDAN P. SHUBER
Represented By: THOMAS W. KING, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH E. LAWRENCE, JR.
Represented By: MARK A. ARONCHICK
Represented By: MILTON VELEZ
Represented By: ROBERT WIYGUL
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Represented By: MICHELE D. HANGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dean
Represented By: MARK A. ARONCHICK
Represented By: MILTON VELEZ
Represented By: ROBERT WIYGUL
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Represented By: MICHELE D. HANGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie A Arkoosh
Represented By: MARK A. ARONCHICK
Represented By: MILTON VELEZ
Represented By: ROBERT WIYGUL
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Represented By: MICHELE D. HANGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: TERENCE GRUGAN
Represented By: EDWARD D. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Represented By: A. MICHAEL PRATT
Represented By: ADAM R. ROSEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?