BOUCHE v. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC.
Plaintiff: MARYSE Z. BOUCHE
Defendant: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05495
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EVE R. KELLER on behalf of THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC. with Certificate of Service(KELLER, EVE)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC..(STEINBERG, SIDNEY)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY R. STEINBERG on behalf of THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC. with Certificate of Service(STEINBERG, SIDNEY)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARYSE Z. BOUCHE. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC. waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/24/2021. (VANCE, ROBERT)
November 5, 2020 Summons Issued as to THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/5/2020 (bw, )
November 4, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARYSE Z. BOUCHE. (JL )
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14688900.), filed by MARYSE Z. BOUCHE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(VANCE, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOUCHE v. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC.
Represented By: SIDNEY R. STEINBERG
Represented By: EVE R. KELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARYSE Z. BOUCHE
Represented By: ROBERT T. VANCE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?