BUSH v. LABRUM et al
Plaintiff: GERALD BUSH
Defendant: MR. JACKSON, MR. LABRUM, PHILADELPHIA REDEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MR. HELLER OF RDA, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA and PAULITTE ADAMS
Case Number: 2:2020cv05631
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, COVER SHEETS, NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED filed by GERALD BUSH..(rf, )
November 25, 2020 PLEADING #3 MAILED TO PRO SE ALONG WITH FORMS (JL )
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF BUSH SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE BUSH WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/24/20. 11/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE WITH IFP FORMS.(amas, )
November 16, 2020 MAILED OUT PRO SE GUIDELINES ON 11/16/20. (jaa, )
November 9, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GERALD BUSH. (md, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JACKSON, LABRUM, filed by GERALD BUSH. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUSH v. LABRUM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. LABRUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA REDEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. HELLER OF RDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULITTE ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD BUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?