GUERRIOS v. GARMAN et al
Petitioner: JOSE GUERRIOS
Respondent: MARK C. GARMAN and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY JOSH SHAPIRO
Case Number: 2:2020cv05766
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Document #3 mailed to pro se petitioner. (kw, )
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT CONTRARY TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 9.3(b) AND RULE 2 OF THE RULES GOVERNING SEC. 2254 CASES IN THE U.S. DISTRICT COURTS, GUERRIOS DID NOT USE THE CURRENT STANDARD 28 U.S.C. SEC. 2254 FORM REQUIRED BY THIS COURT, ETC. IF GUERRIOS INTENDS TO PURSUE THIS MATTER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 2254, HE SHALL SUBMIT A NOTICE TO THIS COURT STATING THAT HE WISHES TO PROCEED WITH THE CURRENT LITIGATION WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/3/20. 12/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(kw, )
November 23, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PPE221282 (dmc, )
November 19, 2020 DOC. 2 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JOSE GUERRIOS. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUERRIOS v. GARMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK C. GARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE GUERRIOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?