WALGREEN COMPANY v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC. et al
Plaintiff: WALGREEN COMPANY
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PLIVA, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, HIKMA LABS, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GREENSTONE LLC, MALLINCKRODT INC., TORRENT PHARMA INC., DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PFIZER INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC, Mylan N.V., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, CITRON PHARMA LLC, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., ALVOGEN INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA, UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, WEST-WARD COLUMBUS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,, AKORN, INC., VERSAPHARM, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., MYLAN, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC. and LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06258
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Strides Pharma Science Limited with Certificate of Service by STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,.(TWEEN, DOUGLAS)
February 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS M. TWEEN on behalf of STRIDES PHARMA, INC., with Certificate of Service(TWEEN, DOUGLAS)
February 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA INC. with Certificate of Service(DONAHUE, LAUREN)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J SMITH on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, BRIAN)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO REPSOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/28/2021. 1/28/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO CIVIL ACTION NO. 20-6258)(kp, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by WILLIAM J. BLECHMAN on behalf of WALGREEN COMPANY(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
December 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., ALVOGEN INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CITRON PHARMA LLC, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA, GREENSTONE LLC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., HIKMA LABS, INC., HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, MALLINCKRODT INC., MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, INC., Mylan N.V., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC, STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, TORRENT PHARMA INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD COLUMBUS, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/14/2020 (bw, )
December 11, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WALGREEN COMPANY. (lisad, )
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by WALGREEN COMPANY.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2020: #1 EXHIBIT 1) (kp, ).
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. by WALGREEN COMPANY.(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14776500.), filed by WALGREEN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALGREEN COMPANY v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVOGEN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD COLUMBUS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA USA INC.
Represented By: LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC PHARMA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,
Represented By: DOUGLAS M. TWEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERSAPHARM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: NATHAN M. BUCHTER
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALGREEN COMPANY
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BLECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?