HAMPTON v. SPEEDWAY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MOSES HAMPTON
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC and RICHARD MYRICK
Case Number: 2:2020cv06279
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION TO REMAND #2 IS SET FOR 3/8/2021 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 Praecipe to reinstate complaint by MOSES HAMPTON. (DITOMASO, RICHARD) Modified on 2/5/2021 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 Reply Brief in Further Support re #2 First MOTION to Remand to State Court PA Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by MOSES HAMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DITOMASO, RICHARD) Modified on 1/15/2021 (lisad, ).
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 Praecipe to reinstate complaint by MOSES HAMPTON. (DITOMASO, RICHARD) Modified on 1/7/2021 (lisad, ).
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 2/24/2021 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 First MOTION to Remand to State Court PA filed by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(DROOGAN, MICHAEL)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (afm, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit F PART 2, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(DITOMASO, RICHARD)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by SPEEDWAY, LLC.(DROOGAN, MICHAEL)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION to Remand to State Court PA filed by MOSES HAMPTON.notice of motion. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(DITOMASO, RICHARD)
December 14, 2020 Case Eligible for Arbitration(lisad, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SPEEDWAY, LLC with Certificate of Service (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14779377), filed by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track Form)(DROOGAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMPTON v. SPEEDWAY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSES HAMPTON
Represented By: RICHARD DITOMASO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL T. DROOGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD MYRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?